EP2667796 - DRILLING DEVICE FOR MAKING A BONE CANAL WITH A CURVED PROFILE INSIDE THE BODY OF A VERTEBRA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariance 17 rue James Watt Zone d'Activités 62000 Dainville / FR | [2016/15] |
Former [2013/49] | For all designated states Clariance rue James Watt, zone d'Activités 62000 Dainville / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILLON, Adrien 35 rue René Cassin 59790 Rochin / FR | 02 /
LEROY, Jean Yves 391 rue de Saint André 62870 Campagne-les-hesdin / FR | 03 /
TORNIER, Alain 299 Chemin de Buttit 38330 Saint Ismier / FR | 04 /
VIART, Guy 6 rue de Vaulx Vraucourt 62128 Saint Leger / FR | 05 /
GANGI, Afshin 10 Am Shulacker 77933 Lahr / DE | 06 /
ORTIZ, Orlando 88 Fifth Street Garden City New York USA 11530 / US | [2016/27] |
Former [2013/49] | 01 /
BILLON, Adrien 35 rue René Cassin F-59790 Rochin / FR | ||
02 /
LEROY, Jean Yves 391 rue de Saint André F-62870 Campagne-les-hesdin / FR | |||
03 /
TORNIER, Alain 299 Chemin de Buttit F-38330 Saint Ismier / FR | |||
04 /
VIART, Guy 6 rue de Vaulx Vraucourt F-62128 Saint Leger / FR | |||
05 /
GANGI, Afshin 10 Am Shulacker 77933 Lahr / DE | |||
06 /
ORTIZ, Orlando 88 Fifth Street Garden City New York USA 11530 / US | Representative(s) | Jeannet, Olivier Roosevelt Consultants 139 rue Vendôme 69477 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2016/27] |
Former [2013/49] | Jeannet, Olivier ROOSEVELT CONSULTANTS Brevets 109 Rue Sully BP 6138 69466 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 12702594.8 | 10.01.2012 | [2016/27] | WO2012FR50046 | Priority number, date | FR20110000199 | 24.01.2011 Original published format: FR 1100199 | [2013/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012101354 | Date: | 02.08.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2667796 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2667796 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16, A61B17/17, A61B17/34, A61B17/00 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
A61B17/1671 (EP,US);
A61B17/1637 (EP,US);
A61B17/1642 (EP,US);
A61B17/1631 (EP,US);
A61B17/1697 (EP,US);
A61B17/1757 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BOHRVORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KNOCHENKANALS MIT GEWÖLBTEM PROFIL IN EINEM WIRBELKÖRPER | [2013/49] | English: | DRILLING DEVICE FOR MAKING A BONE CANAL WITH A CURVED PROFILE INSIDE THE BODY OF A VERTEBRA | [2013/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FORAGE POUR LA RÉALISATION D'UN CANAL OSSEUX À PROFIL COURBE À L'INTÉRIEUR DU CORPS D'UNE VERTÈBRE | [2013/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 06.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2012 | AL | 06.07.2016 | CY | 06.07.2016 | CZ | 06.07.2016 | DK | 06.07.2016 | EE | 06.07.2016 | FI | 06.07.2016 | HR | 06.07.2016 | LT | 06.07.2016 | LV | 06.07.2016 | MC | 06.07.2016 | MK | 06.07.2016 | MT | 06.07.2016 | PL | 06.07.2016 | RO | 06.07.2016 | RS | 06.07.2016 | SE | 06.07.2016 | SI | 06.07.2016 | SK | 06.07.2016 | SM | 06.07.2016 | TR | 06.07.2016 | BG | 06.10.2016 | NO | 06.10.2016 | GR | 07.10.2016 | IS | 06.11.2016 | PT | 07.11.2016 | IE | 10.01.2017 | LU | 10.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 10.01.2012 | |
AL | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.01.2017 | ||
LU | 10.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 10.01.2012 | |
AL | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.01.2017 | ||
LU | 10.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.01.2012 | |
AL | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.01.2017 | ||
LU | 10.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 06.07.2016 | |
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.01.2017 | ||
LU | 10.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.01.2017 | ||
LU | 10.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 10.01.2017 | ||
LU | 10.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/02] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
LU | 10.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 06.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2004043271 (VERTELINK CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * page 18, line 1 - page 20, line 16; figures 2,4,5,30 *; | [Y]US2010211076 (GERMAIN AARON [US], et al) [Y] 1-25* paragraphs [0043] - [0049]; figures 4,6a,6b,7a,7b * |