EP2675888 - NEURONAL NETWORK BASED BIOSENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The European Union, represented by the European Commission Rue de la Loi, 200 1049 Brussels / BE | [2013/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOBANSKI, Tomasz Annankatu 18 00120 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
NOVELLINO, Antonio Via Filippo Palizzi 24/4 16148 Genova (GE) / IT | 03 /
WHELAN, Maurice Via Michelangelo 6 21021 Angera / IT | [2017/14] |
Former [2014/01] | 01 /
SOBANSKI, Tomasz Annankatu 18 00120 Helsinki / FI | ||
02 /
NOVELLINO, Antonio Via Filippo Palizzi 24/4 I-16148 Genova (GE) / IT | |||
03 /
WHELAN, Maurice Via Michelangelo 6 I-21021 Angera / IT | |||
Former [2013/52] | 01 /
SOBANSKI, Tomasz Via Roma 4/4 I-21020 Ranco / IT | ||
02 /
NOVELLINO, Antonio Via Filippo Palizzi 24/4 I-16148 Genova (GE) / IT | |||
03 /
WHELAN, Maurice Via Michelangelo 6 I-21021 Angera / IT | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2013/52] | Application number, filing date | 12702855.3 | 10.02.2012 | [2017/14] | WO2012EP52346 | Priority number, date | EP20110154830 | 17.02.2011 Original published format: EP 11154830 | [2013/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012110426 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2675888 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2675888 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/34, G01N27/403, G01N33/487, C40B30/06 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
G01N33/5005 (EP);
G01N33/5438 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF NEURONALEM NETZWERK BASIERENDER BIOSENSOR | [2013/52] | English: | NEURONAL NETWORK BASED BIOSENSOR | [2013/52] | French: | BIOCAPTEUR À BASE DE RÉSEAU NEURONAL | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 26.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2012 | AL | 05.04.2017 | AT | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | ES | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | NL | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | RS | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | NO | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 10.02.2012 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 10.02.2012 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
NO | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 05.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009322309 (ZHU JING [CN], et al) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0067] *; | [XA] - BUZANSKA L ET AL, "Neural stem cells from human cord blood on bioengineered surfacesNovel approach to multiparameter bio-tests", TOXICOLOGY, LIMERICK, IR, vol. 270, no. 1, ISSN 0300-483X, (20100330), pages 35 - 42, (20090616), XP026982364 [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-18 | [A] - BERDONDINI L ET AL, "A microelectrode array (MEA) integrated with clustering structures for investigating in vitro neurodynamics in confined interconnected sub-populations of neurons", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 114, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.SNB.2005.04.042, ISSN 0925-4005, (20060330), pages 530 - 541, (20060330), XP025112077 [A] 1-18 * "2.Methods" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.snb.2005.04.042 | [A] - MELANIE JUNGBLUT ET AL, "Triangular neuronal networks on microelectrode arrays: an approach to improve the properties of low-density networks for extracellular recording", BIOMEDICAL MICRODEVICES, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20090915), vol. 11, no. 6, doi:DOI:10.1007/S10544-009-9346-0, ISSN 1572-8781, pages 1269 - 1278, XP019746536 [A] 1-18 * "2. Materials and methods";; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10544-009-9346-0 | [A] - JUN S B ET AL, "Low-density neuronal networks cultured using patterned poly-l-lysine on microelectrode arrays", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHER B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 160, no. 2, ISSN 0165-0270, (20070315), pages 317 - 326, (20070215), XP026863301 [A] 1-18 * "2.Materials and methods" * | [A] - IAN L JONES ET AL, "The potential of microelectrode arrays and microelectronics for biomedical research and diagnostics", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20100731), vol. 399, no. 7, doi:DOI:10.1007/S00216-010-3968-1, ISSN 1618-2650, pages 2313 - 2329, XP019880474 [A] 1-18 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-010-3968-1 | by applicant | - "A microelectrode array (MEA) integrated with clustering structures for investigating in vitro neurodynamics in confined interconnected sub-populations of neurons", L. BERDONDINI ET AL., Sensors and Actuators B, ELSEVIER, (2006), vol. 114, pages 530 - 541 | - "Neural stem cells from human cord blood on bioengi- neered surfaces - Novel approach to multiparameter biotests", L. BUZANSKA ET AL., Toxicology, ELSEVIER IRELAND, (2010), vol. 270, pages 35 - 42 | - SOUSSOU ET AL., IEEE TBE, (2007), vol. 54 | - ANA RUIZ; LEONORA BUZANSKA; DOUGLAS GILLILAND; HUBERT RAUSCHER; LUCEL SIRGHI; TOMASZ SOBANSKI; MARZENA ZYCHOWICZ; LAURA CERIOTTI;, "Micro-stamped surfaces for the patterned growth of neural stem cells", BIOMATERIALS, (200812), vol. 29, no. 36, doi:doi:10.1016/j.biomaterials.2008.08.017, pages 4766 - 4774, XP055050898 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2008.08.017 |