EP2670765 - C-17 AND C-3 MODIFIED TRITERPENOIDS WITH HIV MATURATION INHIBITORY ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIIV HEALTHCARE UK (NO. 4) LIMITED 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2017/41] |
Former [2016/46] | For all designated states VIIV HEALTHCARE (NO. 4) LIMITED 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 05843-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REGUEIRO-REN, Alicia c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 02 /
LIU, Zheng c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 03 /
SWIDORSKI, Jacob c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 04 /
SIN, Ny c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 05 /
VENABLES, Brian Lee c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 06 /
SIT, Sing-Yuen c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 07 /
CHEN, Yan c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 08 /
CHEN, Jie c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 09 /
MEANWELL, Nicholas A. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Learoyd, Stephanie Anne, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2017/42] |
Former [2013/50] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12702947.8 | 27.01.2012 | [2017/42] | WO2012US22852 | Priority number, date | US201161437893P | 31.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161437893 P | [2013/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012106190 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2670765 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2670765 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07J63/00, A61K31/56, A61P31/18 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
A61K31/565 (EP,US);
C07J63/00 (KR);
A61K31/56 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | C-17- C-3-MODIFIZIERTE TRITERPENOIDE MIT HIV-REIFUNGSHEMMENDER WIRKUNG | [2013/50] | English: | C-17 AND C-3 MODIFIED TRITERPENOIDS WITH HIV MATURATION INHIBITORY ACTIVITY | [2013/50] | French: | TRITERPÉNOÏDES MODIFIÉS EN C-17 ET C-3 PRÉSENTANT UNE ACTIVITÉ INHIBITRICE DE LA MATURATION DU VIH | [2013/50] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 26.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2012 | AL | 18.10.2017 | AT | 18.10.2017 | CY | 18.10.2017 | CZ | 18.10.2017 | DK | 18.10.2017 | EE | 18.10.2017 | FI | 18.10.2017 | HR | 18.10.2017 | LT | 18.10.2017 | LV | 18.10.2017 | MC | 18.10.2017 | MK | 18.10.2017 | PL | 18.10.2017 | RO | 18.10.2017 | RS | 18.10.2017 | SI | 18.10.2017 | SK | 18.10.2017 | SM | 18.10.2017 | TR | 18.10.2017 | BG | 18.01.2018 | NO | 18.01.2018 | GR | 19.01.2018 | IE | 27.01.2018 | LU | 27.01.2018 | MT | 27.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | IS | 18.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.01.2012 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
MT | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 27.01.2012 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
MT | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
MT | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
MT | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 18.10.2017 | |
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009100532 (VIROCHEM PHARMA INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document, in particular pages 67-68, compounds 8-1, 9-1; pages 71-73, compounds 11-1, 12-1, 13-1, 13-2 * * page 99 - page 101; table 6 *; | [YP]WO2011153315 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [YP] 1-20 * the whole document, in particular claims 1,11 and page 1, paragraph 1 *; | [YP]WO2011153319 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [YP] 1-20* the whole document, in particular claims 1,11 and page 1, paragraph 1 * | by applicant | US5413999 | US5679828 | WO0245652 | US2005209246 | US2005239748 | WO2006053255 | US7354924 | US7365221 | US2008207573 | WO2009058859 | WO2009100532 | WO2011007230 | - KASHIWADA, Y. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, pages 1016 - 1017 | - POKROVSKII, A. G. ET AL., GOS. NAUCHNYI TSENTR VIRUSOL. BIOTEKHNOL, (2001), vol. 9, pages 485 - 491 | - DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (1999), vol. 24, no. 12, pages 1355 - 1362 | - CELL, (19991029), vol. 9, pages 243 - 246 | - DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (200005), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 183 - 194 | - MEANWELL, NICHOLAS A.; KADOW, JOHN F., CURRENT OPINION IN DRUG DISCOVERY & DEVELOPMENT, (2003), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 451 - 461 | - J. AGUILERA ET AL., TETRAHEDRON ASYMMETRY, (2008), vol. 19, page 302 |