EP2670729 - PREVENTION OF PRECIPITATION FROM NITRATED AROMATIC CRUDE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLARDT, Holger Straße des Friedens 4 01987 Schwarzheide / DE | 02 /
RAICHLE, Andreas Luitpoldstraße 160b 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
REETZ, Reiner Grenzweg 7 01987 Schwarzheide / DE | 04 /
BÜTTNER, Johannes Am Fliess 18 01945 Ruhland / DE | 05 /
ZÖLLINGER, Michael Schellingstraße 8 73054 Eislingen / DE | 06 /
HAASE, Stefanie Rosenthalstraße 50 01900 Bretnig-Hauswalde / DE | 07 /
FRITZ, Rüdiger Lindenstraße 3 02994 Bernsdorf / DE | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2013/50] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12703028.6 | 30.01.2012 | WO2012EP51457 | Priority number, date | EP20110152741 | 31.01.2011 Original published format: EP 11152741 | [2013/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012104254 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2670729 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2670729 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01J39/02, B01J39/04, B01J39/20, B01J49/00, B01J39/10, C07C201/16 | [2015/12] | CPC: |
B01J39/20 (EP);
B01J39/02 (EP);
B01J39/04 (EP);
B01J39/10 (EP);
B01J49/06 (EP);
B01J49/53 (EP);
C07C201/16 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C201/16, C07C205/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/50] | C07C201/16, B01J41/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERHINDERUNG VON AUSFÄLLUNGEN AUS NITRIERTEN AROMATISCHEN ROHPRODUKTEN | [2013/50] | English: | PREVENTION OF PRECIPITATION FROM NITRATED AROMATIC CRUDE PRODUCTS | [2013/50] | French: | EMPÊCHEMENT DE PRÉCIPITATIONS À PARTIR DE PRODUITS BRUTS AROMATIQUES NITRIFIÉS | [2013/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 20.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.07.2015 | BG | 22.07.2015 | CY | 22.07.2015 | CZ | 22.07.2015 | DK | 22.07.2015 | EE | 22.07.2015 | ES | 22.07.2015 | FI | 22.07.2015 | HR | 22.07.2015 | IT | 22.07.2015 | LT | 22.07.2015 | LV | 22.07.2015 | MC | 22.07.2015 | MK | 22.07.2015 | MT | 22.07.2015 | NL | 22.07.2015 | PL | 22.07.2015 | RO | 22.07.2015 | RS | 22.07.2015 | SE | 22.07.2015 | SI | 22.07.2015 | SK | 22.07.2015 | SM | 22.07.2015 | TR | 22.07.2015 | NO | 22.10.2015 | GR | 23.10.2015 | IS | 22.11.2015 | PT | 23.11.2015 | GB | 30.01.2016 | IE | 30.01.2016 | LU | 30.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | BG | 22.07.2015 | |
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MK | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
NL | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
TR | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
GB | 30.01.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CY | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MK | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
NL | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
TR | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
GB | 30.01.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MT | 22.07.2015 | ||
NL | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
GB | 30.01.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
GB | 30.01.2016 | ||
IE | 30.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
GB | 30.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 22.07.2015 | |
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 22.07.2015 | |
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 22.07.2015 | |
NO | 22.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 22.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1031450 (BAYER AG) [A] 1-10 * Ansprüche 1-7; Beispiel 2; Seite 1, Zeile 19 - Seite 2, Zeile 23 *; | [A]DE1221994 (BAYER AG) [A] 1-10* Ansprüche 1-3 * |