Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013338598 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP52037 | 07.02.2012 | EP11154049 | 10.02.2011 | US201213983394 | 07.02.2012 | US201161441038 | 09.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103384540 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP52037 | 07.02.2012 | EP11154049 | 10.02.2011 | US201161441038 | 09.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2673027 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP52037 | 07.02.2012 | EP11154049 | 10.02.2011 | EP12703300 | 07.02.2012 | US201161441038 | 09.02.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012107440 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11154049 | 10.02.2011 | US201161441038 | 09.02.2011 |