EP2675678 - PTO TRANSMISSION SYSTEM IN AN AGRICULTURAL OR INDUSTRIAL VEHICLE AND METHOD OF OPERATING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Industrial Italia S.p.A. Via Plava 80 10135 Torino / IT | [2014/22] |
Former [2013/52] | For all designated states CNH Italia S.p.A. Via Plava 80 10135 Turin / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBER, Christian Lerchenring 8 A-Wolfern 4493 / AT | 02 /
MORSELLI, Riccardo Via medicine 183/i San Vito di Spilamberto I-41057 Modena / IT | 03 /
POSSELIUS, John, H. 360 Rose Hill Road Ephrata, Pennsylvania 17522 / US | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | CNH Industrial IP Department CNH Belgium NV Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [2016/16] |
Former [2013/52] | CNH IP Department C/o CNH Belgium NV Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 12703852.9 | 16.02.2012 | [2016/16] | WO2012EP52720 | Priority number, date | IT2011TO00136 | 17.02.2011 Original published format: IT TO20110136 | [2013/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012110615 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2675678 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2675678 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/10, B60W10/06, B60W10/30, B60W30/18, F16H61/47, F16H47/04, F16H37/08 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
B60K17/28 (EP,US);
B60K25/06 (US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/103 (EP,US);
B60W10/30 (EP,US);
B60W30/1888 (EP,US);
F16H61/47 (EP,US);
F16H63/44 (EP,US);
B60W2510/105 (EP,US);
B60W2510/305 (EP);
B60W2520/28 (EP,US);
B60W2556/50 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/22 (EP,US);
F16H2037/0866 (EP,US);
F16H2037/088 (EP,US);
F16H2059/366 (EP,US);
F16H2059/666 (EP,US);
F16H47/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZAPFWELLENGETRIEBESYSTEM BEI EINEM LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN ODER INDUSTRIEFAHRZEUG SOWIE BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/52] | English: | PTO TRANSMISSION SYSTEM IN AN AGRICULTURAL OR INDUSTRIAL VEHICLE AND METHOD OF OPERATING THEREOF | [2013/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION DE PRISE DE FORCE DANS UN VÉHICULE AGRICOLE OU INDUSTRIEL ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 29.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2012 | AL | 20.04.2016 | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | HR | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | MK | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | RS | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | SM | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.07.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | IS | 20.08.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 16.02.2012 | |
AL | 20.04.2016 | ||
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 16.02.2012 | |
AL | 20.04.2016 | ||
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.02.2012 | |
AL | 20.04.2016 | ||
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 16.02.2012 | |
AL | 20.04.2016 | ||
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.02.2012 | |
AL | 20.04.2016 | ||
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 20.04.2016 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
NO | 20.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4191270 (MONTEITH DONALD A [US]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]EP1205338 (NEW HOLLAND ITALIA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1554920 (CNH BELGIUM NV [BE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006183599 (STEEN MARCUS [SE], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19621391 | US6692395 |