EP2670651 - ROCKER PANEL INTENDED FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE AND HAVING AN ANTI-GRITTING COATING NOT OBSTRUCTING THE RAINWATER DRAINAGE AREAS, AND VEHICLE COMPRISING SUCH A ROCKER PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA VPIB - LG081 Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARTHUY, Laurent 68 Rue Bourdignon F-94100 St Maur Des Fosses / FR | 02 /
NGUYEN, Viet Serge 6 place du Maréchal Delattre de Tassigny F-94550 Chevilly Larue / FR | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Fosse, Danièle PSA Automobiles SA VPIB - LG081 18 rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Fosse, Danièle Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Propriété Industrielle - LG081 18, rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 12705361.9 | 23.01.2012 | WO2012FR50144 | Priority number, date | FR20110050846 | 03.02.2011 Original published format: FR 1150846 | [2013/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012104520 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2670651 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2670651 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/20, B62D25/24, B62D25/02 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
B62D25/24 (EP);
B62D25/025 (EP);
B62D25/2072 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWELLENABDECKUNG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT EINER ABSPLITTERUNGSVERHINDERNDEN BESCHICHTUNG OHNE REGENWASSERABFLUSSBLOCKIERUNG UND FAHRZEUG MIT EINER SOLCHEN SCHWELLENABDECKUNG | [2013/50] | English: | ROCKER PANEL INTENDED FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE AND HAVING AN ANTI-GRITTING COATING NOT OBSTRUCTING THE RAINWATER DRAINAGE AREAS, AND VEHICLE COMPRISING SUCH A ROCKER PANEL | [2013/50] | French: | BAS DE CAISSE POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE PRÉSENTANT UN REVÊTEMENT ANTI-GRAVILLONAGE N'OBSTRUANT LE ZONES DE DRAINAGE D'EAU DE PLUIE ET VEHICULE COMPORTANT UN TEL BAS DE CAISSE | [2014/41] |
Former [2013/50] | BAS DE CAISSE POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE PRÉSENTANT UN REVÊTEMENT ANTI-GRAVILLONAGE N'OBSTRUANT LES ZONES DE DRAINAGE D'EAU DE PLUIE ET VEHICULE COMPPORTANT UN TEL BAS DE CAISSE | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 19.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2012 | AL | 11.03.2015 | AT | 11.03.2015 | BG | 11.03.2015 | CY | 11.03.2015 | CZ | 11.03.2015 | DK | 11.03.2015 | EE | 11.03.2015 | FI | 11.03.2015 | HR | 11.03.2015 | IT | 11.03.2015 | LT | 11.03.2015 | LV | 11.03.2015 | MC | 11.03.2015 | MK | 11.03.2015 | MT | 11.03.2015 | NL | 11.03.2015 | PL | 11.03.2015 | RO | 11.03.2015 | RS | 11.03.2015 | SE | 11.03.2015 | SI | 11.03.2015 | SK | 11.03.2015 | SM | 11.03.2015 | TR | 11.03.2015 | NO | 11.06.2015 | GR | 12.06.2015 | IS | 11.07.2015 | PT | 13.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 23.01.2012 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
BG | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
TR | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 23.01.2012 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
TR | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.01.2012 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 11.03.2015 | |
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 11.03.2015 | |
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 11.03.2015 | |
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 11.03.2015 | |
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 11.03.2015 | |
NO | 11.06.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2007196715 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]JP2006123761 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]JP2009173202 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]JPS63119181U (-) [A] 1-7 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB589164 (STANDARD PRESSED STEEL CO, et al) [A] 1-7 * page 3, lines 43-63; figures 4,5 * | by applicant | JP2007196715 | JP2006123761 |