Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] |
02.03.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.04.2015 | Change - extension states | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
14.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant | |
05.03.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.10.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
31.10.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
27.09.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.09.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.09.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.08.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.08.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.08.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.03.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication |