EP2807582 - MANAGEMENT APPARATUS AND MANAGEMENT METHOD FOR HIERARCHICAL STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAIKA, Nobuyuki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
KANIE, Homare c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
ARAI, Hitoshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 04 /
MURAKAMI, Atsushi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 05 /
IKAWA, Hirofumi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12705478.1 | 13.02.2012 | WO2012JP00944 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013121456 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2807582 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
G06F16/185 (EP,CN,US);
G06F16/1756 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Title | German: | VERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR HIERARCHISCHES SPEICHERSYSTEM | [2014/49] | English: | MANAGEMENT APPARATUS AND MANAGEMENT METHOD FOR HIERARCHICAL STORAGE SYSTEM | [2014/49] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION POUR SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE HIÉRARCHIQUE | [2014/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 12.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2008046670 (IBM [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2008155192 (IITSUKA TAKAYOSHI [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0077] *; | [Y]US6269382 (CABRERA LUIS FELIPE [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 55 - column 6, line 52 * * column 10, line 24 - column 14, line 4 * * column 24, line 52 - column 27, line 5 *; | [Y]WO2004109556 (ARKIVIO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0060] *; | [Y]US2008010325 (YAMAKAWA SATOSHI [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2011076294 |