EP2671346 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING A USER WITH CHARGING-RELATED VOICE SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, Avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Xiang yang 388 Ningqiao RD Shanghai Shanghai 201206 / CN | 02 /
CAI, Yigang 23643 Royal Worlington Dr. Naperville Illinois 60564 / US | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2013/50] | Hervouet, Sylvie, et al Ipsilon Feray Lenne Conseil Le Centralis 63 avenue du General Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 12705907.9 | 04.01.2012 | WO2012IB00157 | Priority number, date | CN20111036090 | 01.02.2011 Original published format: CN201110036090 | [2013/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012104712 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2671346 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/14, H04M7/12 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
H04L12/1403 (EP,US);
H04W4/24 (KR);
H04L12/14 (KR,US);
H04L12/1425 (EP,US);
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04L65/104 (EP,US);
H04M15/61 (EP,US);
H04M15/70 (EP,US);
H04M15/705 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERSORGUNG EINES BENUTZERS MIT EINEM SPRACHDIENST IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT GERÄTELADUNGEN | [2013/50] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING A USER WITH CHARGING-RELATED VOICE SERVICE | [2013/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR FOURNIR À UN UTILISATEUR UN SERVICE VOCAL RELATIF À LA FACTURATION | [2013/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 18.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/42] | 12.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/52] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 07.11.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Cited in | International search | [YA]US6700961 (DACLOUSH ELIAS JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * column 2, line 43 - column 5, line 25; figures 1-3 * [A] 1,4-8; | [IY]EP1780939 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [I] 1-8,13 * page 3, paragraph 23 - page 4, paragraph 41; figure 1 * [Y] 2,3; | [XYI]US2007133575 (CAI YIGANG [US], et al) [X] 13,14 * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 1, paragraph 15 - page 6, paragraph 69; figures 1-6 * [Y] 11,12 [I] 9-12,15; | [IY]US2008123603 (CAI YIGANG [US], et al) [I] 1,4-10 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,11,12; | [IAY] - CAI Y ET AL, "IP MULTIMEDIA SUBSYSTEM ONLINE SESSION CHARGING CALL CONTROL", BELL LABS TECHNICAL JOURNAL, WILEY, CA, US, (20060101), vol. 4, no. 10, doi:10.1002/BLTJ.20129, ISSN 1089-7089, pages 117 - 132, XP001239291 [I] 13 * the whole document * [A] 1,4-8 [Y] 2,3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bltj.20129 | [IDAY] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); LTE; Telecommunication management; Charging management; IP Multimedia Subsystem (IMS) charging (3GPP TS 32.260 version 9.6.0 Release 9)", TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20110101), vol. 3GPP SA 5, no. V9.6.0, XP014062044 [ID] 1,6 * page 58, paragraph 5.3 IMS Online Charging Scenarios - page 73, paragraph 5.3.2.3.2 Indication to UE of reason for IMS s. r.; figures 5.3.2.2.1.3.1-4 * [A] 4,5,7,8 [Y] 2,3 | [A] - MELANCHUK T ET AL, "An Architectural Framework for Media Server Control; rfc5567.txt", AN ARCHITECTURAL FRAMEWORK FOR MEDIA SERVER CONTROL; RFC5567.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARD, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20090601), XP015065599 [A] 9-11 * page 3, paragraph 2. Terminology - page 11, paragraph 5.3. Advanced IVR Services; figures 1-3 * |