EP2673917 - METHODS FOR SECURE DISTANCE BOUNDING/DISTANCE RANGING BETWEEN TWO DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETH Zurich ETH Transfer, HG E 47-49 Raemistrasse 101 8092 Zürich ETH-Zentrum / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | For all designated states ETH Zurich ETH Transfer, HG E 47-49 Raemistrasse 101 8092 Zürich ETH-Zentrum / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANEV, Boris Eibenstrasse 11 CH-8045 Zürich / CH | 02 /
CAPKUN, Srdjan Bombachstrasse 21 CH-8049 Zürich / CH | 03 /
BASIN, David Alpenstrasse 11 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [2013/51] | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 12706436.8 | 13.02.2012 | WO2012CH00040 | Priority number, date | EP20110001133 | 11.02.2011 Original published format: EP 11001133 | [2013/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012106830 | Date: | 16.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2673917 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, H04W12/06 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/1466 (EP,US);
H04L9/3271 (EP,US);
H04W12/069 (EP,US);
H04L63/0492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SICHEREN ENTFERNUNGSHERSTELLUNG/ENTFERNUNGSMESSUNG ZWISCHEN ZWEI VORRICHTUNGEN | [2013/51] | English: | METHODS FOR SECURE DISTANCE BOUNDING/DISTANCE RANGING BETWEEN TWO DEVICES | [2013/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE DÉLIMITATION DE DISTANCE/MESURE DE DISTANCE SÉCURISÉES ENTRE DEUX DISPOSITIFS | [2013/51] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/51] | 26.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/07] | 01.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP2247024 (NXP BV [NL]) [X] 1-7,9-17,19-25,27-29 * paragraphs [0041] - [0062] * [A] 8,18,26; | [XA]EP1603276 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7,9-17,19-25,27-29 * the whole document * [A] 8,18,26 | [XA] - HANCKE G P ET AL, "An RFID Distance Bounding Protocol", SECURECOMM2005,, (20050905), doi:10.1109/SECURECOMM.2005.56, ISBN 978-0-7695-2369-9, pages 67 - 73, XP010902873 [X] 1-7,9-17,19-25,27-29 * the whole document * [A] 8,18,26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SECURECOMM.2005.56 | [XA] - KASPER BONNE RASMUSSEN SRDJAN CAPKUN, "Realization of RF Distance Bounding", (20100813), pages 1 - 13, 20100813, URL: http://www.syssec.ethz.ch/research/freqdb.pdf, XP007919426 [X] 1-7,9-17,19-25,27-29 * the whole document * [A] 8,18,26 | [XA] - AHMED BENFARAH ET AL, "Distance Bounding Protocols on TH-UWB Radios", GLOBECOM 2010, 2010 IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101206), doi:10.1109/GLOCOM.2010.5684029, ISBN 978-1-4244-5636-9, pages 1 - 6, XP031846511 [X] 1-7,9-17,19-25,27-29 * the whole document * [A] 8,18,26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.2010.5684029 | [XA] - MARC KUHN ET AL, "UWB impulse radio based distance bounding", POSITIONING NAVIGATION AND COMMUNICATION (WPNC), 2010 7TH WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100311), ISBN 978-1-4244-7158-4, pages 28 - 37, XP031814984 [X] 1-7,9-17,19-25,27-29 * the whole document * [A] 8,18,26 | by applicant | - "Distance bounding protocols", STEFAN BRANDS; DAVID CHAUM, EUROCRYPT '93, SPRINGER-VERLAG NEW YORK, INC, (1994), pages 344 - 359 |