Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2689051 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2689051



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 592
21.11.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.02.2018 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
21.12.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.12.2017 English translation of the claims Search / examination 8
06.12.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.12.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 9
06.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.08.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.08.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.08.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.08.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 57
08.08.2017 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 57
22.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.12.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
22.12.2016 Claims Search / examination 7
22.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.12.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
27.09.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.09.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.09.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.07.2014 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 146
22.07.2014 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
25.06.2014 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
05.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.05.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
05.05.2014 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 2
07.01.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.11.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
04.11.2013 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
30.10.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.10.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
09.09.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.08.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
23.10.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 53
23.10.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 61
04.10.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
04.10.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
04.10.2012 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 59
25.05.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
25.05.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
25.05.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 2
27.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
27.02.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
27.02.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 8
27.02.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 50