EP2689051 - AQUEOUS CORROSION PROTECTION FORMULATION BASED ON SILANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2018/03] |
Former [2014/05] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBERT, Philipp Spitalstr. 72A 79539 Lörrach / DE | 02 /
JUST, Eckhard Dürerstr. 57 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | [2014/05] | Application number, filing date | 12706821.1 | 27.02.2012 | [2018/03] | WO2012EP53256 | Priority number, date | DE20111006182 | 25.03.2011 Original published format: DE102011006182 | DE20111084183 | 07.10.2011 Original published format: DE102011084183 | [2014/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012130544 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2689051 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2689051 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/68, C09D4/00, C09D183/08, C09D5/08, C09D5/10, C23C18/12, C23C22/48, C23C22/50 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
C09D4/00 (EP,US);
C09D5/08 (US);
C09D5/084 (EP,US);
C09D5/10 (EP,US);
C23C18/122 (EP,US);
C23C18/1254 (EP,US);
C23C18/127 (EP,US);
C23C22/48 (EP,US);
C23C22/50 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/05] | C23C22/68, C09D4/00, C09D183/08, C09D5/08, C09D5/10, C23C18/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE KORROSIONSSCHUTZFORMULIERUNG AUF SILANEBASIS | [2014/05] | English: | AQUEOUS CORROSION PROTECTION FORMULATION BASED ON SILANES | [2014/05] | French: | FORMULATION AQUEUSE ANTICORROSION À BASE DE SILANE | [2014/05] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 05.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2012 | AL | 17.01.2018 | CY | 17.01.2018 | EE | 17.01.2018 | FI | 17.01.2018 | HR | 17.01.2018 | LT | 17.01.2018 | LV | 17.01.2018 | MC | 17.01.2018 | MK | 17.01.2018 | MT | 17.01.2018 | PT | 17.01.2018 | RO | 17.01.2018 | RS | 17.01.2018 | SE | 17.01.2018 | SI | 17.01.2018 | SK | 17.01.2018 | SM | 17.01.2018 | AT | 27.02.2018 | IE | 27.02.2018 | LU | 27.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | BG | 17.04.2018 | GR | 18.04.2018 | IS | 17.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 27.02.2012 | |
AL | 17.01.2018 | ||
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
PT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
AT | 27.02.2018 | ||
IE | 27.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
AT | 27.02.2018 | ||
IE | 27.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SI | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 27.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
IE | 27.02.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
SM | 17.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
SK | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
EE | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MC | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RO | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 17.01.2018 | |
CY | 17.01.2018 | ||
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
MT | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
LV | 17.01.2018 | ||
RS | 17.01.2018 | ||
SE | 17.01.2018 | ||
BG | 17.04.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IS | 17.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | ||
GR | 18.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 17.01.2018 | |
FI | 17.01.2018 | ||
HR | 17.01.2018 | ||
LT | 17.01.2018 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2006079516 (SIGMA COATINGS BV [NL], et al); | [AD]WO2006137663 (POSCO [KR], et al); | [XDI]WO2009030538 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE], et al) | by applicant | EP0274428 | US5051129 | US5206285 | EP0590270 | EP0716128 | WO9914277 | WO0039177 | WO0046311 | WO0222745 | EP1191075 | US6468336 | WO03022940 | EP1191075 | WO2004076717 | WO2004076718 | DE10335178 | US6929826 | US6955728 | DE102004037045 | WO2006079516 | WO2006137663 | EP1760128 | WO2008133916 | WO2009030538 | WO2009059798 |