|
10.10.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.08.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
02.08.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
08.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.09.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Certificate of deposit of biological material |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Certificate of deposit of biological material |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Certificate of deposit of biological material |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Certificate of deposit of biological material |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Certificate of deposit of biological material |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Certificate of deposit of biological material |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.2013 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
24.01.2013 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.01.2013 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.01.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.01.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.01.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
24.01.2013 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.01.2013 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
07.12.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.12.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
83 |
|
16.08.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.08.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
30.04.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.04.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.04.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
32 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |