Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8927252 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2015 | B2 | US2013336931 | 19.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1100084 | 09.02.2011 | SE1100487 | 21.06.2011 | WO2012SE50131 | 09.02.2012 | SE1100455 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5905032B | Global Dossier | 20.04.2016 | B2 | JP2014506463 | 17.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | SE1100084 | 09.02.2011 | SE1100487 | 21.06.2011 | WO2012SE50131 | 09.02.2012 | SE1100455 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103491969 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | SE1100084 | 09.02.2011 | SE1100487 | 21.06.2011 | WO2012SE50131 | 09.02.2012 | SE1100455 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2672980 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2017 | B1 | EP2672980 | 18.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1100084 | 09.02.2011 | SE1100487 | 21.06.2011 | WO2012SE50131 | 09.02.2012 | SE1100455 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013020312 | 23.03.2021 | B1 | BR112013020312 | 18.10.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | SE1100084 | 09.02.2011 | SE1100487 | 21.06.2011 | WO2012SE50131 | 09.02.2012 | SE1100455 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2672980T | 26.02.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | SE1100084 | 09.02.2011 | SE1100487 | 21.06.2011 | WO2012SE50131 | 09.02.2012 | SE1100455 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2672980T | 12.03.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | SE1100084 | 09.02.2011 | SE1100487 | 21.06.2011 | WO2012SE50131 | 09.02.2012 | SE1100455 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2672980T | 30.05.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12706948 | 09.02.2012 | SE1100084 | 09.02.2011 | SE1100487 | 21.06.2011 | WO2012SE50131 | 09.02.2012 | SE1100455 | 13.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012108830 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1100084 | 09.02.2011 | SE1100487 | 21.06.2011 | SE1100455 | 13.06.2011 |