EP2681254 - SOLVENT MIXTURE FOR MOLECULAR WEIGHT CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2014/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Mingqian 19 Royal Crest Road Horseheads New York 14845 / US | 02 /
MATTHEWS, James Robert 21 Katie Lane Painted Post New York 14870 / US | 03 /
SORENSEN, Michael Lesley 451 Fulton Street P.O. Box 93 Waverly New York 14892-0093 / US | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Oldroyd, Richard Duncan Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 12707441.7 | 21.02.2012 | WO2012US25856 | Priority number, date | US201161447524P | 28.02.2011 Original published format: US 201161447524 P | [2014/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012118635 | Date: | 07.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2681254 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/12, C09D165/00, B01J13/00 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
C08G61/126 (EP,US);
C09D165/00 (EP,US);
H10K85/113 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Title | German: | LÖSUNGSMITTELGEMISCH ZUR MOLEKULARGEWICHTSKONTROLLE | [2014/02] | English: | SOLVENT MIXTURE FOR MOLECULAR WEIGHT CONTROL | [2014/02] | French: | MÉLANGE DE SOLVANTS POUR RÉGLAGE DE MASSE MOLÉCULAIRE | [2014/02] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 29.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/19] | 11.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4076921 (STOL MIROSLAV, et al) [X] 1,6-14,16,18,19 * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 44; table 1 * [A] 20; | [XA]US4463164 (DALTON WILLIAM O [US], et al) [X] 1,5-10,14,16,18,19 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 7; examples 9,10,13 * [A] 20; | [XA]US6353072 (TOWNS ROBERT CARL [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,14,16,18,19 * examples 9-11 * [A] 20; | [XA]US2005070685 (MITSUI AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6-14,16,18,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] - [0010] - [0061] , [0074] , [0084] - [0088]; examples 1-10 * [A] 20; | [XA]DE102006061966 (BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-9,16,18,19 * abstract * [A] 20; | [XA]EP2169007 (SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS IP [NL]) [X] 1,5-14,16,18,19 * paragraphs [0017] , [0024] * [A] 20; | [XAI]US2011017956 (HOU JIANHUI [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,14,16,18,19 * example 2; claim 1 * [A] 20 [I] 4,15,17; | [X] - MINGQIAN HE ET AL, "IMPORTANCE OF C2 SYMMETRY FOR THE DEVICE PERFORMANCE OF A NEWLY SYNTHESIZED FAMILY OF FUSED-RING THIOPHENES", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, vol. 22, no. 9, doi:10.1021/CM100524P, ISSN 0897-4756, (20100901), pages 2770 - 2779, (20100330), XP002664246 [X] 20 * abstract * * table 1 * * scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm100524p | [X] - MINGQIAN HE ET AL, "Alkylsubstituted Thienothiophene Semiconducting Materials: Structure-Property Relationships", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC; US, vol. 131, no. 33, doi:10.1021/JA903895S, ISSN 0002-7863, (20090101), pages 11930 - 11938, (20090731), XP002664245 [X] 20 * abstract * * table 1 * * scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja903895s | [X] - HON HANG FONG ET AL, "Tetrathienoacene Copolymers As High Mobility, Soluble Organic Semiconductors", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20081008), vol. 130, no. 40, doi:10.1021/ja804872x, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 13202 - 13203, XP055005003 [X] 20 * scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja804872x | [XDA] - AERT ET AL, "Controlled molecular weight by the precipitation polymerization of 2,6-dimethylphenol", JOURNAL OF MACROMOLECULAR SCIENCE , PART A - PURE AND APPLIED CHEMISTRY, MARCEL DEKKER INC, US, (19950101), vol. 32, no. 3, doi:10.1080/10601329508013680, ISSN 1060-1325, pages 515 - 523, XP009160337 [XD] 1,5-10,14,16,18,19 * the whole document * [A] 20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10601329508013680 | by applicant | US7705108 | US7838623 | - G. ODIAN, Principles of Polymerization, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1991), page 302 | - VAN AERT ET AL., "Controlled molecular weight by the precipitation polymerization of 2,6-dimethylphenol", J. MACROMOLECULAR SCI. PURE AND APPLIED CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. A32, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1080/10601329508013680, pages 515 - 523, XP009160337 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10601329508013680 | - FEISER; FEISER, REAGENTS FOR ORGANIC SYNTHESIS, (1967), vol. 1 | US20100649079 | US20100781291 |