EP2652005 - POLY(BUTYLENE TEREPHTHALATE) ESTER COMPOSITIONS, METHODS OF MANUFACTURE, AND ARTICLES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | ||
Former [2013/43] | For all designated states SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELL, Philip, Wesley 32 Park Ridge Drive Mount Vernon, IN 47620 / US | 02 /
SHAH, Dhaval 318 Charity Circle Evansville, IN 47712 / US | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | Stiebe, Lars Magnus, et al Balder Paseo de la Castellana 93, 5 28046 Madrid / ES | [2018/13] |
Former [2013/43] | Stiebe, Lars Magnus, et al Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 120 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 12708208.9 | 22.02.2012 | [2018/13] | WO2012US26051 | Priority number, date | US201113032051 | 22.02.2011 Original published format: US201113032051 | [2013/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012116028 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2652005 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2652005 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/00, C08G63/78, C08J11/04 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08G63/00 (KR);
C08G63/183 (US);
C08G63/78 (KR);
C08J11/04 (KR);
C08J5/00 (KR);
C08L67/00 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L69/00, C08L51/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLY(BUTYLENTEREPHTHALAT) ESTER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE FORMTEILE | [2017/44] | English: | POLY(BUTYLENE TEREPHTHALATE) ESTER COMPOSITIONS, METHODS OF MANUFACTURE, AND ARTICLES THEREOF | [2013/43] | French: | COMPOSITION D'UN ESTER DE POLY(BUTYLENETEREPHTHALATE), PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET PRODUITS | [2017/44] |
Former [2013/43] | POLY(BUTYLENTEREPHTHALAT)-ESTERZUSAMMENSETZUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND ARTIKEL DARAUS | ||
Former [2013/43] | COMPOSITIONS D'ESTER DE POLY(BUTYLÈNE TÉRÉPHTALATE), PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET LEURS ARTICLES | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 30.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2012 | AL | 28.03.2018 | AT | 28.03.2018 | CY | 28.03.2018 | CZ | 28.03.2018 | DK | 28.03.2018 | EE | 28.03.2018 | ES | 28.03.2018 | FI | 28.03.2018 | HR | 28.03.2018 | IT | 28.03.2018 | LT | 28.03.2018 | LV | 28.03.2018 | MC | 28.03.2018 | MK | 28.03.2018 | NL | 28.03.2018 | PL | 28.03.2018 | RO | 28.03.2018 | RS | 28.03.2018 | SE | 28.03.2018 | SI | 28.03.2018 | SK | 28.03.2018 | SM | 28.03.2018 | TR | 28.03.2018 | BG | 28.06.2018 | NO | 28.06.2018 | GR | 29.06.2018 | IS | 28.07.2018 | PT | 30.07.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.02.2012 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CY | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IS | 28.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CY | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IS | 28.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CY | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
TR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
ES | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
NL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH11302443 ; | [XI]US5266601 (KYBER MANFRED [DE], et al) [X] 3-11,13,15 * table 10 * [I] 3-15; | [XY]US5952520 (NAUJOKAS ANDRIUS ALGIMANTAS [US]) [X] 1,2 * claims 1,6 * * column 4, lines 55-65 * * examples 1-3 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]EP1344765 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * claims 1,2,9 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0055] , [0074] * * examples 1,4 * * paragraphs [0113] - [0116] - [ 127] , [ 128] *[Y] 1-15; | [XY]EP1437377 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0077] , [0 78] , [0104]; claim 1 * [Y] 1-15; | [XY]WO2007089600 (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al) [X] 3-11,13,15 * claims 1,2,29,33 * * page 6, paragraph 5 * * page 7, paragraph 1 * * pages 11,12 * * page 20 - page 21 * * table 2 * * examples 11-15; tables 6,7 * * examples 16-17; table 9 * [Y] 3-15; | [XY] - UKIELSKI R ET AL, "EFFECT OF CHEMICAL MODIFICATION OF POLY(BUTYLENE TEREPHTHALATE) ON ELASTIC PROPERTIES", INTERNATIONAL POLYMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, RAPRA TECHNOLOGY, SHREWABURY, GB, (20040101), vol. 31, no. 3, ISSN 0307-174X, pages T/70 - T/75, XP001192932 [X] 1-15 * claim 1 * * column 3, paragraph 6 * * column 4; table 1 * * columns 5,6; tables 2,3 * [Y] 1-15 | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 03, Database accession no. 2000-033619, XP002680772 & JPH11302443 A 19991102 (KK IS) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 1-15 |