Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018193277 | ![]() | 12.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | US201815912640 | 06.03.2018 | US201313984922 | 11.09.2013 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9943488 | ![]() | 17.04.2018 | B2 | US2014004202 | 02.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101799620B | ![]() | 20.11.2017 | B1 | KR20140051118 | 30.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5869004B | ![]() | 24.02.2016 | B2 | JP2014505094 | 27.02.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL227631 | ![]() | 31.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103347503B | ![]() | 01.06.2016 | B | CN103347503 | 09.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2825053 | ![]() | 02.04.2019 | C | CA2825053 | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012215252C | ![]() | 25.05.2017 | C1 | AU2012215252B | 19.01.2017 | B2 | AU2012215252 | 15.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2672961 | ![]() | 06.06.2018 | B1 | EP2672961 | 18.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013020412 | 07.12.2021 | B1 | BR112013020412 | 25.10.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1120655T | 11.12.2019 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2672961T | 17.09.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA026403 | 28.04.2017 | B1 | EA201300902 | 30.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2680638T | 10.09.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1185007 | 07.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20181338T | 19.10.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | EP12708564 | 03.02.2012 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2672961T | 10.09.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA34886 | 01.02.2014 | B1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX362613 | 28.01.2019 | B | MX2013008299 | 16.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ613206 | 31.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12013501661 | 10.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2672961T | 30.11.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | EP12708564 | 03.02.2012 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS57615 | 30.11.2018 | B1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | EP12708564 | 03.02.2012 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2672961T | 30.10.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | EP12708564 | 03.02.2012 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT201800544T | 11.01.2019 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | EP12708564 | 03.02.2012 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA113506 | 10.02.2017 | C2 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | WO2012FR00046 | 03.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012107652 | ![]() | 16.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR085360 | 25.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2013002243 | 31.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2971422 | 20.05.2016 | B1 | FR2971422 | 17.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE039484T | 28.01.2019 | T2 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2672961T | 19.10.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR201811120T | 27.08.2018 | T4 | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI533865B | 21.05.2016 | B | TW201309285 | 01.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1100433 | 11.02.2011 |