EP2673134 - APPARATUS FOR FORMING A CARTON BLANK TO A BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/51] | DEVICE FOR SHAPING A FLAT BLANK INTO A CONTAINER | ||
[2014/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANK, Alexander Kirchbergstrasse 44 8207 Schaffhausen / CH | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/51] | 01 /
FRANK, Alexander Kirchbergstrasse 44 CH-8207 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 12708764.1 | 31.01.2012 | WO2012EP51501 | Priority number, date | DE20111004004 | 11.02.2011 Original published format: DE102011004004 | [2013/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012107317 | Date: | 16.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2673134 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2673134 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B31B1/00 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
B31B50/00 (EP,US);
B65D1/22 (US);
B31B2100/00 (EP,US);
B31B2110/35 (EP,US);
B31B50/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUM FORMEN EINES FLACHZUSCHNITTS ZU EINEM BEHÄLTER | [2013/51] | English: | APPARATUS FOR FORMING A CARTON BLANK TO A BOX | [2014/37] | French: | INSTALLATION POUR TRANSFORMER UN FLAN EN CARTON EN UNE BOITE | [2014/37] |
Former [2013/51] | DEVICE FOR SHAPING A FLAT BLANK INTO A CONTAINER | ||
Former [2013/51] | DISPOSITIF SERVANT À FAÇONNER UNE DÉCOUPE PLATE POUR OBTENIR UN RÉCIPIENT | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/51] | 07.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2012 | AL | 28.01.2015 | CY | 28.01.2015 | CZ | 28.01.2015 | DK | 28.01.2015 | EE | 28.01.2015 | FI | 28.01.2015 | HR | 28.01.2015 | LT | 28.01.2015 | LV | 28.01.2015 | MC | 28.01.2015 | MK | 28.01.2015 | MT | 28.01.2015 | NL | 28.01.2015 | PL | 28.01.2015 | RO | 28.01.2015 | RS | 28.01.2015 | SE | 28.01.2015 | SI | 28.01.2015 | SK | 28.01.2015 | SM | 28.01.2015 | TR | 28.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | IE | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | LU | 31.01.2015 | FR | 30.03.2015 | BG | 28.04.2015 | NO | 28.04.2015 | GR | 29.04.2015 | IS | 28.05.2015 | PT | 28.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 31.01.2012 | |
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MK | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
IE | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
LU | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 30.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
PT | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 31.01.2012 | |
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
IE | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
LU | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 30.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
PT | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 31.01.2012 | |
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
IE | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 30.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
PT | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
IE | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 30.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
IE | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 30.03.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
IE | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | FI | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | FI | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | FI | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 28.01.2015 | |
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 31.01.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]ES2177470 (TECNICART APLICACIONS TECNIQUE [ES]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2930294 (ARTHUR RITSCHER) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4988331 (BOISSEAU JEAN-LOUIS [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |