EP2688951 - USE OF EPOXIDIZED ARYLALKYLPHENOLS AS REACTIVE RESIN DILUENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RÜTGERS Germany GmbH Kekuléstrasse 30 44579 Castrop-Rauxel / DE | For all designated states Hexion GmbH Gennaer Strasse 2-4 58642 Iserlohn-Letmathe / DE | [2015/14] |
Former [2014/05] | For all designated states RÜTGERS Germany GmbH Kekuléstrasse 30 44579 Castrop-Rauxel / DE | ||
For all designated states Momentive Specialty Chemicals GmbH Gennaer Strasse 2-4 58642 Iserlohn-Letmathe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEDRICH, Bodo Kirchstr. 16 47137 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
HILLNER, Knut Sandforter Weg 110a 59379 Selm / DE | 03 /
HERZOG, Rolf Beethovenstrasse 12a 46240 Bottrop / DE | 04 /
MÜHLENBROCK, Peter Vinckestrasse 11a 40470 Düsseldorf / DE | 05 /
GREWING, Manuela Roderichstrasse 50 47441 Moers / DE | 06 /
SICHELSCHMIDT, Dirk Hüskenbusch 9 47167 Duisburg / DE | 07 /
TERHARDT, Martina Hummelsterstrasse 31 40724 Hilden / DE | [2014/08] |
Former [2014/05] | 01 /
FRIEDRICH, Bodo Roggenkamp 40 47138 Duisburg / DE | ||
02 /
HILLNER, Knut Sandforter Weg 110a 59379 Selm / DE | |||
03 /
HERZOG, Rolf Beethovenstrasse 12a 46240 Bottrop / DE | |||
04 /
MÜHLENBROCK, Peter Vinckestrasse 11a 40470 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
05 /
GREWING, Manuela Roderichstrasse 50 47441 Moers / DE | |||
06 /
SICHELSCHMIDT, Dirk Hüskenbusch 9 47167 Duisburg / DE | |||
07 /
TERHARDT, Martina Hummelsterstrasse 31 40724 Hilden / DE | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12708815.1 | 07.03.2012 | WO2012EP53890 | Priority number, date | DE20111015193 | 25.03.2011 Original published format: DE102011015193 | [2014/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012130570 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2688951 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/1515, C08G59/36, C08G59/40 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
C08G59/621 (EP,US);
C08K5/1515 (EP,KR,US);
C07D303/04 (EP,US);
C08G59/223 (EP,US);
C08G59/36 (KR);
C08G59/40 (KR);
C09D163/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EPOXIDIERTER ARYLALKYLPHENOLE ALS REAKTIVHARZVERDÜNNER | [2014/05] | English: | USE OF EPOXIDIZED ARYLALKYLPHENOLS AS REACTIVE RESIN DILUENTS | [2014/05] | French: | UTILISATION D'ARYLALKYLPHÉNOLS ÉPOXYDÉS COMME DILUANT DE RÉSINE RÉACTIF | [2014/05] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 13.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0007761 (KENRICH PETROCHEMICALS [US]) [I] 1-10 * page 1A, line 4 - line 5 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE3427425 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * | by applicant | CH324686 | EP0656384 |