EP2681553 - METHOD FOR THE DETERMINATION OF POLYSORBATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxalta GmbH Zählerweg 4 6300 Zug / CH | For all designated states Baxalta Incorporated 1200 Lakeside Drive Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US | [2017/47] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Baxalta GmbH Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark, Opfikon / CH | ||
For all designated states Baxalta Incorporated 1200 Lakeside Drive Bannockburn, IL 60015 / US | |||
Former [2014/02] | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | ||
For all designated states Baxter Healthcare S.A. Thurgauerstrasse 130 8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Alfred Skraupstrasse 24/42/8 1210 Vienna / AT | 02 /
ENGELMAIER, Andrea Benedikt Schellingergasse 17/25 1150 Vienna / AT | 03 /
ANDERLE, Heinz Kautekgasse 12/6 3400 Klosterneuburg / AT | 04 /
SCHWARZ, Hans-Peter Weimarer Strasse 76 1180 Vienna / AT | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/19] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/02] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12709015.7 | 01.03.2012 | [2017/19] | WO2012EP00898 | Priority number, date | US201161449535P | 04.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161449535 P | [2014/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012119724 | Date: | 13.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2681553 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2681553 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, G01N33/92 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
G01N33/50 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/31 (KR);
G01N33/483 (KR);
G01N33/92 (EP,US);
G01N2400/00 (EP,US);
Y10T436/142222 (US);
Y10T436/17 (US);
Y10T436/172307 (US);
Y10T436/173076 (US);
Y10T436/173845 (US);
Y10T436/25 (US);
Y10T436/25125 (US);
Y10T436/25375 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON POLYSORBAT | [2014/02] | English: | METHOD FOR THE DETERMINATION OF POLYSORBATE | [2014/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA DÉTERMINATION DE POLYSORBATE | [2014/02] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 02.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 10.05.2017 | HR | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | MK | 10.05.2017 | RS | 10.05.2017 | SM | 10.05.2017 | NO | 10.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HR | 10.05.2017 | |
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | HR | 10.05.2017 | |
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | HR | 10.05.2017 | |
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | HR | 10.05.2017 | |
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | HR | 10.05.2017 | |
NO | 10.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [I]CN101639439 (DONGGUAN TAILI BIOTECH CO LTD) [I] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A] - KASUYA, YOKO ET AL, "Analytical method of determinating polysorbates in foods by HPLC", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2009:1005579, URL: STN, XP002679084 [A] 1-17 * abstract * |