EP2681805 - SYSTEM OF PLUG CONNECTORS FASTENED TO MOUNTING RAILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harting Electric GmbH & Co. KG Wilhelm-Harting-Strasse 1 32339 Espelkamp / DE | [2014/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLEGEL, Bernard Bauerbrinker Str. 59 32369 Rahden / DE | 02 /
NASS, Andreas An der Oberheide 45 31606 Warmsen / DE | 03 /
GRIEPENSTROH, Sebastian Am Weiher 16A 32312 Lübbecke / DE | 04 /
GARSKE, Stefan Lindenstraße 27 49152 Bad Essen / DE | [2017/03] |
Former [2014/02] | 01 /
SCHLEGEL, Bernard Bauerbrinker Str. 59 32369 Rahden / DE | ||
02 /
NASS, Andreas An der Oberheide 45 31606 Warmsen / DE | |||
03 /
GRIEPENSTROH, Sebastian Winkelstraße 1 32369 Rahden / DE | |||
04 /
GARSKE, Stefan Wörthstraße 23a 49082 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 12709274.0 | 19.01.2012 | [2017/03] | WO2012DE100011 | Priority number, date | DE20111001069 | 03.03.2011 Original published format: DE102011001069 | [2014/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012116691 | Date: | 07.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2681805 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2681805 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/514, H01R13/73, // G02B6/38 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
H01R13/73 (EP,US);
H01R13/629 (KR);
H01R13/514 (EP,US);
H01R9/26 (KR);
G02B6/3897 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/02] | H01R9/26, H01R13/629 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM VON AUF MONTAGESCHIENEN FIXIERTEN STECKVERBINDERN | [2014/02] | English: | SYSTEM OF PLUG CONNECTORS FASTENED TO MOUNTING RAILS | [2014/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONNECTEURS ENFICHABLES FIXÉS SUR DES RAILS DE MONTAGE | [2014/02] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 06.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.01.2017 | CY | 18.01.2017 | EE | 18.01.2017 | HR | 18.01.2017 | LT | 18.01.2017 | LV | 18.01.2017 | MC | 18.01.2017 | MK | 18.01.2017 | MT | 18.01.2017 | RS | 18.01.2017 | SI | 18.01.2017 | SK | 18.01.2017 | SM | 18.01.2017 | IE | 19.01.2017 | LU | 19.01.2017 | BG | 18.04.2017 | GR | 19.04.2017 | IS | 18.05.2017 | PT | 18.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/51] | CY | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CY | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 18.01.2017 | |
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | EE | 18.01.2017 | |
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 19.01.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | EE | 18.01.2017 | |
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
LU | 19.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | EE | 18.01.2017 | |
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | EE | 18.01.2017 | |
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | HR | 18.01.2017 | |
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 |