EP2699379 - LASER BEAM WELDING DEVICE AND LASER BEAM WELDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Thorsten Eichenweg 2 96117 Memmelsdorf / DE | 02 /
BORMANN, Axel Wuerzburger Str. 4b 96049 Bamberg / DE | [2014/09] | Application number, filing date | 12709585.9 | 12.03.2012 | WO2012EP54263 | Priority number, date | DE20111007792 | 20.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011007792 | [2014/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012143181 | Date: | 26.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2699379 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/067, B23K26/10, B23K26/28, B23K26/08 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
B23K26/103 (EP);
B23K26/0619 (EP);
B23K26/0643 (EP);
B23K26/067 (EP);
B23K26/0734 (EP);
B23K26/0821 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Title | German: | LASERSTRAHLSCHWEISSVORRICHTUNG UND LASERSTRAHLSCHWEISSVERFAHREN | [2014/09] | English: | LASER BEAM WELDING DEVICE AND LASER BEAM WELDING METHOD | [2014/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOUDAGE PAR FAISCEAU LASER ET PROCÉDÉ DE SOUDAGE PAR FAISCEAU LASER | [2014/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 10.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/43] | 13.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JP2001239381 (NUCLEAR FUEL IND LTD) [X] 1,3,6-8 * the whole document * [A] 10; | [XA]DE102009021448 (FACHHOCHSCHULE JENA [DE]) [X] 1-5,9 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0044]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0106]; figure 7 * [A] 6,7,10; | [X]EP1518664 (LEISTER PROCESS TECH [CH]) [X] 1,3,6-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1905531 (EO TECHNICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * the whole document *; | [XA]DE2658682 (BINGLEY LTD A J) [X] 1-3,6,7 * the whole document * [A] 8; | [XA]EP0119034 (ICI PLC [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * the whole document * [A] 8; | [XA]DE102005000631 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6-8 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0032]; figures 1-3 * [A] 3,9,10; | [XA]DE10020327 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 9,10 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0034]; figure 1; claim 10 * [A] 1,5,6,8; | [X]JPS59107784 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 9,10 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE102007035715 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1,3-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102007035715 |