EP2691428 - PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF AQUEOUS MULTISTAGE POLYMER DISPERSION AND USE THEREOF AS BINDER FOR COATING SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/06] | AQUEOUS MULTISTAGE POLYMER DISPERSION, PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF AS BINDER FOR COATING SUBSTRATES | ||
[2018/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2019/03] |
Former [2014/06] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALK, Roelof Am Wasserturm 5a 67459 Böhl-Iggelheim / DE | 02 /
TUCHBREITER, Arno 4620 Piedmont Row Drive 28210 Charlotte / US | 03 /
LOHMEIJER, Bas Gralsstraße 15/17 68199 Mannheim / DE | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 12709650.1 | 22.03.2012 | [2019/03] | WO2012EP55068 | Priority number, date | EP20110160443 | 30.03.2011 Original published format: EP 11160443 | [2014/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012130712 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2691428 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2691428 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08F265/02, C08F265/06, C08F265/10, C09D151/00, B27K3/15, C08F2/22 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
C08F265/06 (EP,KR,US);
B27K3/00 (KR);
C08F2/22 (EP,KR);
C08F265/02 (EP,KR);
C08F265/10 (EP,KR);
C08F8/44 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F265/02, C08F220/1804, C08F220/14 (KR,EP,US);
C08F265/06, C08F220/14 (EP);
C08F265/10, C08F220/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/06] | C08F265/02, C08F265/06, C08F265/10, C09D151/00, B27K3/00, C08F2/22, C08F8/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MEHRSTUFIGEN WÄSSRIGEN POLYMERISATDISPERSIONEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS BINDEMITTEL FÜR DIE BESCHICHTUNG VON UNTERGRÜNDEN | [2018/33] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF AQUEOUS MULTISTAGE POLYMER DISPERSION AND USE THEREOF AS BINDER FOR COATING SUBSTRATES | [2018/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D ́UNE DISPERSION AQUEUSE MULTI-ÉTAPE DE POLYMÉRISAT ET SON UTILISATION COMME LIANT POUR LE REVÊTEMENT DE SUPPORTS | [2018/28] |
Former [2014/06] | WÄSSRIGE MEHRSTUFIGE POLYMERISATDISPERSION, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS BINDEMITTEL FÜR DIE BESCHICHTUNG VON UNTERGRÜNDEN | ||
Former [2014/06] | AQUEOUS MULTISTAGE POLYMER DISPERSION, PROCESS FOR ITS PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF AS BINDER FOR COATING SUBSTRATES | ||
Former [2014/06] | DISPERSION AQUEUSE MULTI-ÉTAPE DE POLYMÉRISAT, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET SON UTILISATION COMME LIANT POUR LE REVÊTEMENT DE FONDS | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 26.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2012 | AL | 16.01.2019 | CY | 16.01.2019 | CZ | 16.01.2019 | DK | 16.01.2019 | EE | 16.01.2019 | HR | 16.01.2019 | LT | 16.01.2019 | LV | 16.01.2019 | MC | 16.01.2019 | MK | 16.01.2019 | MT | 16.01.2019 | PL | 16.01.2019 | RO | 16.01.2019 | RS | 16.01.2019 | SI | 16.01.2019 | SK | 16.01.2019 | SM | 16.01.2019 | IE | 22.03.2019 | LU | 22.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | BG | 16.04.2019 | GR | 17.04.2019 | IS | 16.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.03.2012 | |
AL | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
MT | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
MT | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
MT | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
IE | 22.03.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
LU | 22.03.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 16.01.2019 | |
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HR | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HR | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | LT | 16.01.2019 | |
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | LT | 16.01.2019 | |
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | LT | 16.01.2019 | |
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | LT | 16.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XDA]DE4439459 (BASF AG [DE]) [XD] 1-11,13-16 * page 8, line 63 - line 68; example 1; claims 1-24 * [A] 12; | [A]AT402504B (VIANOVA KUNSTHARZ AG [AT]) [A] 1-16 * examples 1-5; claims 1, 2 *; | [XA]US5962571 (OVERBEEK GERARDUS CORNELIS [NL], et al) [X] 1-11,13-16 * examples 1-8; claim 50 * [A] 12; | [XA]EP1167477 (DAINIPPON TORYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-11,13-16 * example Comp. Ex. 4 * [A] 12; | [A]WO2011009838 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document * | by applicant | US4269749 | US4733005 | EP0338486 | US5081166 | EP0690882 | EP0710680 | DE19624299 | EP0758347 | EP0771328 | EP0789724 | DE19609509 | DE19621027 | DE19741184 | DE19741187 | DE19805122 | WO9925780 | DE19828183 | DE19839199 | DE19840586 | EP0989163 | DE19847115 | EP1125949 | EP0710680 | EP1294816 | WO03029300 | WO2005121595 | EP1614732 | US2008058473 | EP1978044 | - T.G. FOX, BULL. AM. PHYS. SOC., (1956), vol. 1, page 123 | - Ullmann's Encyclopadie der technischen Chemie, 4. Auflage,, VERLAG CHEMIE, (1980), vol. 19, page 18 | - Ullmann's Ecyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, VCH, (1992), vol. 5, page 169 | - "Methoden der organischen Chemie", HOUBEN-WEYL, Makromolekulare Stoffe, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (1961), vol. XIV/1, pages 411 - 420 | - "Methoden der organischen Chemie", HOUBEN-WEYL, Makromolekulare Stoffe, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (1961), pages 192 - 208 | - "Methoden der organischen Chemie", HOUBEN-WEYL, Makromolekulare Stoffe, GEORG-THIEME-VERLAG, (1961), vol. XIV/1, pages 192 - 208 | - "Analysis of Polymer Disper sions with an Eight-Cell-AUC-Multiplexer: High Resolution Particle Size Distribution and Density Gradient Techniques", S.E. HARDING; W. MÄCHTLE ET AL., Analytical Ultracentrifugation in Biochemistry and Polymer Science, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, (1992), pages 147 - 175 | - Ullmanns Enzyklopadie der technischen Chemie, 4. Aufl., VERLAG CHEMIE, (1980), vol. 19, page 17 |