EP2678327 - HETEROARYL DERIVATIVES AS ALPHA7 NACHR MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lupin Limited Kalpataru Inspire 3rd Floor Off Western Express Highway Santacruz (East) Mumbai 400 055 / IN | [2017/08] |
Former [2016/35] | For all designated states Lupin Limited Kalpataru Inspire 3rd Floor, Off Western Express Highway Santacruz (East) Mumbai 400055 / IN | ||
Former [2014/01] | For all designated states Lupin Limited 159 CST Road Kalina Santacruz (East) State of Maharashtra, Mumbai 400 098 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINHA, Neelima Lupin Limited (Research Park) 46A/47A Village Nande Taluka Mulshi, Maharashtra Pune 411 042 / IN | 02 /
JANA, Gourhari Lupin Limited (Research Park) 46A/47A Village Nande Taluka Mulshi, Maharashtra Pune 411 042 / IN | 03 /
SACHCHIDANAND, Sachchidanand Lupin Limited (Research Park) 46A/47A Village Nande Taluka Mulshi, Maharashtra Pune 411 042 / IN | 04 /
KURHADE, Sanjay, Pralhad Lupin Limited (Research Park) 46A/47A Village Nande Taluka Mulshi, Maharashtra Pune 411 042 / IN | 05 /
KARCHE, Navnath, Popat Lupin Limited (Research Park) 46A/47A Village Nande Taluka Mulshi, Maharashtra Pune 411 042 / IN | 06 /
HAJARE, Anil, Kashiram Lupin Limited (Research Park) 46A/47A Village Nande Taluka Mulshi, Maharashtra Pune 411 042 / IN | 07 /
TILEKAR, Ajay, Ramchandra Lupin Limited (Research Park) 46A/47A Village Nande Taluka Mulshi Maharashtra Pune 411 042 / IN | 08 /
PALLE, Venkata, P. Lupin Limited (Research Park) 46A/47A Village Nande Taluka Mulshi, Maharashtra Pune 411 042 / IN | 09 /
KAMBOJ, Rajender, Kumar Lupin Limited (Research Park) 46A/47A Village Nande Taluka Mulshi, Maharashtra Pune 411 042 / IN | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2016/33] |
Former [2014/01] | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12709965.3 | 22.02.2012 | [2016/33] | WO2012IB50806 | Priority number, date | IN2011KOL242 | 23.02.2011 Original published format: IN 242KO2011 | IN2011KOL1184 | 09.09.2011 Original published format: IN 1184KO2011 | [2017/16] |
Former [2014/01] | IN2011KOL0242 | 23.02.2011 | |
IN2011KOL1184 | 09.09.2011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012114285 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2678327 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2678327 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2678327 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | [2016/39] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2678327 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/22, C07D409/04, A61K31/381, A61P25/28 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
C07D333/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/341 (EP,US);
A61K31/381 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61K31/4436 (EP,US);
A61K31/4535 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C07D207/32 (EP,US);
C07D207/333 (EP,US);
C07D207/337 (EP,US);
C07D307/68 (EP,US);
C07D333/26 (EP,US);
C07D333/36 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/381, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Extension states | BA | 23.09.2013 | ME | 23.09.2013 | Title | German: | HETEROARYLDERIVATE ALS ALPHA7-NACHR-MODULATOREN | [2014/01] | English: | HETEROARYL DERIVATIVES AS ALPHA7 NACHR MODULATORS | [2014/01] | French: | DÉRIVÉS HÉTÉROARYLE À TITRE DE MODULATEURS DES NACHR ALPHA 7 | [2014/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 08.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2017/13] | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2008002974 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [XD] 1-28 * Abstract; page 26, lines 21-27; claims; examples. *; | [X] - TATSUMI ET AL., "(+)-3-[2-(benzo[b]thiophen-2-yl)-2-oxoethyl]-1-azabicyclo[2.2.2]oct ane as potent agonists for the alpha-7 nicotinic acetylcholine receptor", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (20040101), vol. 14, no. 14, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2004.04.091, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 3781 - 3784, XP002327499 [X] 1-28 * Abstract; page 3783, compounds in tables 2 and 3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2004.04.091 | [X] - TATSUMI ET AL., "(R)-3'-(3-Methylbenzo(b)thiophen-5-yl)- spiro(1-azabicyclo(2,2,2)octa ne-3,5'- oxazolidin)-2'-one, a Novel and Potent alpha7 Nicotinic Acetylcholine Receptor Partial Agonist Displays Cognitive Enhancing Properties", J. MED. CHEM., vol. 49, no. 14, doi:10.1021/JM060249C, ISSN 0022-2623, (20060101), pages 4374 - 4383, (20060616), XP002538696 [X] 1-28 * Abstract; page 4378, compounds in tables 1 and 2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JM060249C | by applicant | US4235871 | US4501728 | US4837028 | US5019369 | US5608082 | EP1012142 | US2003236413 | WO2004000792 | EP1489077 | WO2005030715 | WO2005105789 | US2006142349 | US2006258670 | WO2007031440 | EP1790640 | US2007142450 | WO2007092751 | EP1866314 | WO2009043780 | WO2009043784 | WO2009115547 | US2009253691 | WO2009127678 | WO2009127679 | WO2009135944 | WO2009145996 | US7683084 | US7741364 | US2010190819 | US2010222398 | US2010227869 | US2010240707 | WO2010130768 | WO2011036167 | WO2011064288 | - PATERSON D ET AL., PROG. NEUROBIOL., (2000), vol. 61, pages 75 - 111 | - RUBBOLI F ET AL., NEUROCHEM. INT., (1994), vol. 25, pages 69 - 71 | - ALKONDON M ET AL., EUR. J. PHARMACOL., (2000), vol. 393, pages 59 - 67 | - DAJAS-BAILADOR F ET AL., TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (2004), vol. 25, pages 317 - 324 | - BITNER RS ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2007), vol. 27, pages 10578 - 10587 | - MCKAY BE ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (2007), vol. 74, pages 1120 - 1133 | - MANSVELDER HD ET AL., PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY (BERL, (2006), vol. 184, pages 292 - 305 | - CHAN WK ET AL., NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (2007), vol. 52, pages 1641 - 1649 | - YOUNG JW ET AL., EUR. NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOL., (2007), vol. 17, pages 145 - 155 | - FREEDMAN R ET AL., BIOL. PSYCHIATRY, (1995), vol. 38, pages 22 - 33 | - TSUANG DW ET AL., AM. J. MED. GENET., (2001), vol. 105, pages 662 - 668 | - CURZON P ET AL., NEUROSCI. LETT., (2006), vol. 410, pages 15 - 19 | - YOUNG JW ET AL., NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (2004), vol. 29, pages 891 - 900 | - HASHIMOTO K ET AL., BIOL. PSYCHIATRY, (2008), vol. 63, pages 92 - 97 | - CARSON R ET AL., "Neuromolecular", MED., (2008), vol. 10, pages 377 - 384 | - LEONARD S ET AL., PHARMACOL. BIOCHEM. BEHAV., (2001), vol. 70, pages 561 - 570 | - FREEDMAN R ET AL., CURR. PSYCHIATRY REP., (2003), vol. 5, pages 155 - 161 | - CANNON TD ET AL., CURR. OPIN. PSYCHIATRY, (2005), vol. 18, pages 135 - 140 | - LEISER SC ET AL., PHARMACOL. THER., (2009), vol. 122, pages 302 - 311 | - SUEMARU K ET AL., NIPPON YAKURIGAKU ZASSHI, (2002), vol. 119, pages 295 - 300 | - NIZRI E ET AL., DRUG NEWS PERSPECT., (2007), vol. 20, pages 421 - 429 | - WANG HY ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2009), vol. 29, pages 10961 - 10973 | - FEHER A ET AL., DEMENT. GERIATR. COGN. DISORD., (2009), vol. 28, pages 56 - 62 | - NAGELE RG ET AL., NEUROSCIENCE, (2002), vol. 110, pages 199 - 211 | - JEYARASASINGAM G ET AL., NEUROSCIENCE, (2002), vol. 109, pages 275 - 285 | - MARRERO MB ET AL., BRAIN. RES., (2009), vol. 1256, pages 1 - 7 | - KUZMIN A ET AL., PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY (BERL, (2009), vol. 203, pages 99 - 108 | - WEISS RB ET AL., PLOS GENET., (2008), vol. 4, page EL000125 | - SOLINAS M ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2007), vol. 27, pages 5615 - 5620 | - EBBERT JO ET AL., PATIENT. PREFER. ADHERENCE, (2010), vol. 4, pages 355 - 362 | - DECKER MW ET AL., EXPERT. OPIN. INVESTIG. DRUGS, (2001), vol. 10, pages 1819 - 1830 | - ROWBOTHAM MC ET AL., PAIN, (2009), vol. 146, pages 245 - 252 | - DAMAJ MI ET AL., NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 39, pages 2785 - 2791 | - GALLOWITSCH-PUERTA M ET AL., LIFE SCI., (2007), vol. 80, pages 2325 - 2329 | - ROSAS-BALLINA M ET AL., MOL. MED., (2009), vol. 15, pages 195 - 202 | - ROSAS-BALLINA M ET AL., J. INTERN. MED., (2009), vol. 265, pages 663 - 679 | - WESTMAN M ET AL., SCAND. J. IMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 70, pages 136 - 140 | - LIU C ET AL., CRIT. CARE. MED., (2009), vol. 37, pages 634 - 641 | - ARIAS HR ET AL., INT. J. BIOCHEM. CELL. BIOL., (2009), vol. 41, pages 1441 - 1451 | - HEESCHEN C ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2002), vol. 110, pages 527 - 536 | - CALLEJA-MACIAS IE ET AL., INT. J. CANCER., (2009), vol. 124, pages 1090 - 1096 | - SCHULLER HM ET AL., EUR. J. PHARMACOL., (2000), vol. 393, pages 265 - 277 | - OLINCY A ET AL., BIOL. PSYCHIATRY, (2005), vol. 57, no. 8 | - OLINCY A ET AL., ARCH. GEN. PSYCHIATRY, (2006), vol. 63, pages 630 - 638 | - GOLDSTEIN R ET AL., ACAD. EMERG. MED., (2007), vol. 14, no. 15 | - O'DONNELL CJ ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2010), vol. 53, pages 1222 - 1237 | - REDROBE JP ET AL., EUR. J. PHARMACOL., (2009), vol. 602, pages 58 - 65 | - DUNLOP J ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2009), vol. 328, pages 766 - 776 | - PICHAT P ET AL., NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (2007), vol. 32, pages 17 - 34 | - RONCARATI R ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2009), vol. 329, pages 459 - 468 | - VAN KM ET AL., PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY (BERL, (2004), vol. 172, pages 375 - 383 | - BOESS FG ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2007), vol. 321, pages 716 - 725 | - HAUSER TA ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (2009), vol. 78, pages 803 - 812 | - ALBUQUERQUE EX ET AL., ALZHEIMER DIS. ASSOC. DISORD., (2001), vol. 15, no. 1, pages S19 - S25 | - FAGHIH R ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2009), vol. 52, pages 3377 - 3384 | - NG HJ ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., U. S. A., (2007), vol. 104, pages 8059 - 8064 | - TIMMERMANN DB ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (2007), vol. 323, pages 294 - 307 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2009), vol. 52, page 3377 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2005), vol. 46, no. 43, pages 7295 - 7298 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2003), vol. 44, no. 16, pages 3385 - 3386 | - SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (2009), vol. 39, no. 12, pages 2082 - 2092 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2010), vol. 51, no. 15, pages 2048 - 2051 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2008), vol. 49, no. 18, pages 2882 - 2885 | - J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, no. 36, pages 12640 - 12646 | - N. MIYAURA; A. SUZUKI, CHEM. REV., (1995), vol. 95, page 2547 | - J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS.: ORGANIC AND BIOORGANIC CHEMISTRY (1972-1999, (1972), pages 1766 - 1770 | - TETRAHEDRON, (2004), vol. 60, pages 3439 - 43 | - BIOORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 22, pages 387 - 394 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2005), vol. 46, pages 4539 - 4542 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2010), vol. 51, pages 1693 - 1695 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2009), vol. 74, no. 2, pages 903 - 905 | - ORGANIC LETTERS, (2007), vol. 9, no. 25, pages 5191 - 5194 | - TETRAHEDRON, (2006), vol. 62, pages 8243 - 8255 | - SYNLETT, (2002), vol. 7, pages 1152 - 1154 | - N.MIYAURA; A. SUZUKI, CHEM. REV., (1995), vol. 95, page 2547 | - ORGANIC PREPARATIONS AND PROCEDURES INTERNATIONAL, (2002), vol. 37, no. 5, pages 545 - 549 | - BERGE S.M. ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1990), page 1445 | - JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE, (1977), vol. 66, pages 2 - 19 | - THOMSEN MS ET AL., CURR. PHARM. DES., (2010), vol. 16, pages 323 - 343 | - PENG ZZ ET AL., ZHONGHUA YI XUE YI CHUAN XUE ZA ZHI, (2008), vol. 25, pages 154 - 158 | - MARTIN LF ET AL., AM. J. MED. GENET., B NEUROPSYCHIATR. GENET., (2007), vol. 144B, pages 611 - 614 | - MARTIN LF ET AL., PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY (BERL, (2004), vol. 174, pages 54 - 64 | - WILENS TE ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (2007), vol. 74, pages 1212 - 1223 | - VERBOIS SL ET AL., NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, (2003), vol. 44, pages 224 - 233 | - SANBERG PR ET AL., PHARMACOL. THER., (1997), vol. 74, pages 21 - 25 | - BENNOUNA M ET AL., ENCEPHALE, (2007), vol. 33, pages 616 - 620 | - NORDBERG A ET AL., NEUROTOX. RES., (2000), vol. 2, pages 157 - 165 | - HAYDAR SN ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2009), vol. 17, pages 5247 - 5258 | - DEUTSCH SI ET AL., CLIN. NEUROPHARMACOL., (2003), vol. 26, pages 277 - 283 | - ZHAO X ET AL., ANN. N. Y. ACAD. SCI., (2001), vol. 939, pages 179 - 186 | - PERRY E ET AL., EUR. J. PHARMACOL., (2000), vol. 393, pages 215 - 222 | - HARRINGTON CR ET AL., DEMENTIA, (1994), vol. 5, pages 215 - 228 | - WANG J ET AL., J. NEUROSCI. RES., (2010), vol. 88, pages 807 - 815 | - DURIS K ET AL., STROKE, (2011), vol. 42, no. 12, pages 3530 - 6 | - DONNELLY-ROBERTS DL ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1998), vol. 285, pages 777 - 786 | - ROWLEY TJ ET AL., BR. J. ANAESTH., (2010), vol. 105, pages 201 - 207 | - BRUCHFELD A ET AL., J. INTERN. MED., (2010), vol. 268, pages 94 - 101 | - GIEBELEN IA T ET AL., SHOCK, (2007), vol. 27, pages 443 - 447 | - PENA G ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (2010), vol. 40, pages 2580 - 2589 | - Pharmaceutics and Pharmacy Practice, J.B. LIPPINCOTT COMPANY, (1982), pages 238 - 250 | - TOISSEL, ASHP Handbook on Injectable Drugs, (1986), pages 622 - 630 | - SZOKA ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOPHYS. BIOENG., (1980), vol. 9, page 467 | - WASSERMAN ET AL., CANCER, (1975), vol. 36, pages 1258 - 1268 | - J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS-L:0RGANIC AND BIOORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1972), pages 1766 - 1770 | - JCS PERKIN TRANS-I:ORGANIC AND BIOORGANIC CHEMISTRY (1972-1999, (1972), pages 1766 - 1770 | - ORG. LETT., (2007), vol. 9, no. 25, pages 5191 - 5194 | - TETRAHEDRON, (2006), vol. 62, pages 7902 - 7910 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (2010), vol. 75, pages 3855 - 3858 | - FAGHIH R. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2009), vol. 52, pages 3377 - 84 |