EP2681041 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CONTINUOUS COMPOSITE TUBE, APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING CONTINUOUS COMPOSITE TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AO&G Holding B.V. Monnickendamkade 1 1976 EC IJmuiden / NL | [2015/26] |
Former [2015/16] | For all designated states AO&G Holding B.V. Monnickendamkade 1 1976 EC LJmuiden / NL | ||
Former [2014/02] | For all designated states Airborne International B.V. Laan van Ypenburg 70-78 2497 GB 's-Gravenhage / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KREMERS, Marcus Antonius Ivonne Stoombootweg 41 NL-1035 TT Amsterdam / NL | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 12709974.5 | 05.03.2012 | WO2012NL50134 | Priority number, date | NL20112006335 | 03.03.2011 Original published format: NL 2006335 | [2014/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012118379 | Date: | 07.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2681041 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2681041 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B29D23/00, B29C35/00, B29C53/64, B29C53/56, F16L9/16, B29C70/32 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
B29C53/566 (EP,US);
B29C63/0069 (EP,US);
B29C63/105 (EP,US);
B29C70/086 (EP,US);
B29C70/32 (EP,US);
B29C70/386 (EP,US);
B29C70/50 (EP,US);
B29D23/001 (EP,US);
F16L11/16 (EP,US);
F16L9/12 (EP,US);
F16L9/16 (EP,US);
B29C53/68 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/02] | Extension states | BA | 27.09.2013 | ME | 27.09.2013 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DURCHGEHENDER VERBUNDROHRE, VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG DURCHGEHENDER VERBUNDROHRE | [2014/02] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CONTINUOUS COMPOSITE TUBE, APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING CONTINUOUS COMPOSITE TUBE | [2014/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE FABRICATION D'UN TUYAU COMPOSITE CONTINU | [2014/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 25.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2012 | AL | 24.06.2015 | AT | 24.06.2015 | BE | 24.06.2015 | CY | 24.06.2015 | CZ | 24.06.2015 | EE | 24.06.2015 | FI | 24.06.2015 | HR | 24.06.2015 | LT | 24.06.2015 | LV | 24.06.2015 | MC | 24.06.2015 | MK | 24.06.2015 | PL | 24.06.2015 | RO | 24.06.2015 | RS | 24.06.2015 | SE | 24.06.2015 | SI | 24.06.2015 | SK | 24.06.2015 | SM | 24.06.2015 | BG | 24.09.2015 | GR | 25.09.2015 | IS | 24.10.2015 | PT | 26.10.2015 | LU | 05.03.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 05.03.2012 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MK | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.03.2012 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MK | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 24.06.2015 | |
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3494812 (CVACHO DANIEL S) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,14 * figures 5,6 * * columns 1-5 * [I] 3,4,6,7,10-13; | [A]US3531357 (HECKLY CLAUDE) [A] 4,11 * column 6, line 37 *; | [A]WO9803326 (ANSELM ANTHONY CESAR [GB]) [A] 5,6 * page 7, lines 26-30 *; | [A]EP1118450 (NEWELL OPERATING CO [US]) [A] 6,7,12,13 * paragraph [0020] * * figures 6,7 *; | [A]WO2006107196 (AIRBORNE DEV B V [NL], et al) [A] 1-14 * pages 1-3,6-8 ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2010062249 (HARAZONO MASAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 3,10 * figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0060] * | by applicant | WO2006107196 |