EP2675299 - A CASEIN HYDROLYSATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Limerick Plassey Technological Park Limerick / IE | [2013/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FITZGERALD, Dick 17 Castelcourt Courtbrack Avenue South Circular Road Limerick / IE | 02 /
O'SULLIVAN, Dara Bolton's Cross Listowel Co. Kerry / IE | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Purdy, Hugh Barry PurdyLucey Intellectual Property Limited 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/52] | Purdy, Hugh Barry PurdyLucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D2 Dublin / IE | Application number, filing date | 12710158.2 | 17.02.2012 | [2016/17] | WO2012EP52809 | Priority number, date | EP20110154760 | 17.02.2011 Original published format: EP 11154760 | [2013/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012110652 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2675299 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2675299 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A23L33/17, A23J3/34 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
A23J3/344 (EP,CN,US);
C12P21/06 (US);
A23L33/18 (EP,CN,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,CN,US);
C07K14/4732 (US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,CN,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/03, A23V2200/304, A23V2250/54246, A23V2300/28 (CN,EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/52] | A23L1/305, A23J3/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CASEINHYDROLYSAT | [2013/52] | English: | A CASEIN HYDROLYSATE | [2013/52] | French: | HYDROLYSAT DE CASÉINE | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 26.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2012 | AL | 27.04.2016 | AT | 27.04.2016 | BE | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | DK | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | ES | 27.04.2016 | FI | 27.04.2016 | HR | 27.04.2016 | IT | 27.04.2016 | LT | 27.04.2016 | LV | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | MK | 27.04.2016 | PL | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | RS | 27.04.2016 | SE | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SK | 27.04.2016 | SM | 27.04.2016 | TR | 27.04.2016 | NO | 27.07.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | IS | 27.08.2016 | PT | 29.08.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
AL | 27.04.2016 | ||
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
AL | 27.04.2016 | ||
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
AL | 27.04.2016 | ||
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
AL | 27.04.2016 | ||
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.02.2012 | |
AL | 27.04.2016 | ||
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 27.04.2016 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
NO | 27.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO9425580 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [Y] 10-16,20-29 * page 1, lines 16-21 * * page 2, lines 4-7 * * page 3, lines 6-19 * * figure 1; example 2 * [A] 9,17; | [XAY]EP2258208 (UNIV LIMERICK [IE]) [X] 1-8,18,19 * paragraphs [0014] - [0022] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0038] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0045] * * figures 1,4; claims 1-15 * [A] 9,17 [Y] 10-16,20-29; | [YA] - JIANG JINGLI ET AL, "Yak milk casein as a functional ingredient: Preparation and identification of angiotensin-1-converting enzyme inhibitory peptides", JOURNAL OF DAIRY RESEARCH,, (20070201), vol. 74, no. 1, pages 18 - 25, XP009123421 [Y] 10-16,20-29 * abstract * * Table 1, "Flavourzyme" * * Page 19, right column, the sections entitled "Hydrolysate preparation" and "Measurement of the Degree of Hydrolysis (DH)" * * Fig. 2, the first 3 values for "Flavourzyme" * [A] 9,17 | [A] - SPELLMAN D ET AL, "Proteinase and exopeptidase hydrolysis of whey protein: Comparison of the TNBS, OPA and pH stat methods for quantification of degree of hydrolysis", INTERNATIONAL DAIRY JOURNAL, ELSEVIER APPLIED SCIENCE, BARKING, GB, vol. 13, no. 6, ISSN 0958-6946, (20030101), pages 447 - 453, (20030101), XP027139899 [A] 1-29 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0631731 | WO2006130204 | EP2258208 | - FLANAGAN, J.; FITZGERALD, R. J., "Physicochemical and nitrogen solubility properties of Bacillus proteinase hydrolysates of sodium caseinate incubated with transglutaminase pre- and post-hydrolysis", J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2002), vol. 50, no. 19, doi:doi:10.1021/jf011632n, pages 5429 - 5436, XP002379365 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf011632n | - PERKINS, D. N.; CREASEY, D. M.; COTTRELL, J. S., "Probability-based protein identification by searching sequence databases using mass spectrometry data", ELECTROPHORESIS, (1999), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1002/(SICI)1522-2683(19991201)20:18<3551::AID-ELPS3551>3.0.CO;2-2, pages 3551 - 3567, XP002319572 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1522-2683(19991201)20:18<3551::AID-ELPS3551>3.0.CO;2-2 | - RYAN, M.; MCEVOY, E.; DUIGNAN, S.; CROWLEY, C.; FENELON, M.; 0' CALLAGHAN, D.M.; FITZGERALD, R.J., "Thermal stability of soy protein isolate and hydrolysate ingredients", FOOD CHEM., (2008), vol. 108, doi:doi:10.1016/j.foodchem.2007.11.001, pages 503 - 510, XP029228740 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodchem.2007.11.001 | - SIN, H.N.; YUSOF, S.; HAMID, N.; SHEIKH ABDUL; RAHMAN, R. ABD., "Optimization of enzymatic clarification of sapodilla juice using response surface methodology", JOURNAL OF FOOD ENGINEERING, (2006), vol. 73, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jfoodeng.2005.01.031, pages 313 - 319, XP025028775 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jfoodeng.2005.01.031 | - SMYTH M; FITZGERALD R.J., "Relationship between some characteristics ofWPC hydrolysates and the enzyme complement in commercially available proteinase preparations", INT. DAIRY JOURNAL, (1998), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/S0958-6946(98)00121-6, pages 819 - 827, XP001039997 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-6946(98)00121-6 | - SPELLMAN, D.; O'CUINN, G.; FITZGERALD, R. J., "Physicochemical and sensory characteristics of whey protein hydrolysates generated at different total solids levels", J. DAIRY RES., (2005), vol. 72, pages 138 - 143 | - "OPA and pH stat methods for the quantification of degree of hydrolysis", INTERNATIONAL DAIRY JOURNAL, vol. 13, pages 447 - 453 |