EP2710220 - SHEAR VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petroleum Technology Company AS Slettestrandveien 13 4032 Stavanger / NO | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARESTAD, Kristian Harestadveien 4 N-4070 Randaberg / NO | 02 /
SKORVE, Helge Castors gate 15 N-4021 Stavanger / NO | 03 /
TVEITEN, Magnar Bauneveien 7a N-4328 Sandnes / NO | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Zacco Norway AS P.O. Box 488 Skøyen 0213 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Onsagers AS Munkedamsveien 35 P.O. Box 1813 Vika 0123 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 12710903.1 | 15.03.2012 | [2015/50] | WO2012EP54554 | Priority number, date | NO20110000723 | 16.05.2011 Original published format: NO 20110723 | [2014/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012156117 | Date: | 22.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2710220 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2710220 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E21B34/06, E21B34/10 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
E21B43/123 (EP);
E21B34/102 (EP,NO,US);
E21B34/06 (US);
E21B34/063 (EP,NO,US);
F16K3/0281 (US);
Y10T137/1632 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHERVENTIL | [2014/13] | English: | SHEAR VALVE | [2014/13] | French: | VANNE À CISAILLEMENT | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 24.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2012 | AL | 09.12.2015 | AT | 09.12.2015 | BE | 09.12.2015 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | CZ | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | ES | 09.12.2015 | FI | 09.12.2015 | HR | 09.12.2015 | IT | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | LV | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | MK | 09.12.2015 | PL | 09.12.2015 | RO | 09.12.2015 | RS | 09.12.2015 | SE | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | SM | 09.12.2015 | TR | 09.12.2015 | GR | 10.03.2016 | LU | 15.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | IS | 09.04.2016 | PT | 11.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 15.03.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.03.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 15.03.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 15.03.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
LU | 15.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
IT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2009038467 (PETROLEUM TECHNOLOGY COMPANY A [NO], et al) [XD] 1,2,4,7,9,12 * page 5, lines 36-38; figures 1, 2 * * page 6, lines 2, 26, 30 * * page 7, lines 10-22, 31-34 * * page 8, lines 24-26 *; | [X]US4655286 (WOOD EDWARD T [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7 * column 6, lines 13-29, 42-51; figure 4 *; | [I]GB2334276 (SCHLUMBERGER LTD [US]) [I] 1,2,4,7-9 * page 4, lines 11, 16-30; figures 1, 2 * * page 5, lines 3-7, 14, 16, 18-23 *; | [A]US2760408 (TAYLOR WILLIAM B) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | WO2009038467 |