EP2694943 - PROCESS FOR THE MEASUREMENT OF THE HARDNESS AND FOR THE SELECTION OF AGRICULTURAL PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/07] | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR THE MEASUREMENT OF THE HARDNESS AND FOR THE SELECTION OF AGRICULTURAL PRODUCTS | ||
[2016/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unitec S.p.A. Via Provinciale Cotignola, 20/9 48022 Lugo (Ravenna) / IT | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENEDETTI, Luca Via Basilica 166 I-48020 Savarna, Ravenna / IT | 02 /
MACRELLI, Enrico c/o UNITEC S.p.A. Via Provinciale Cotignola 20/9 I-48022 Lugo, RA / IT | 03 /
ROMANI, Aldo c/o UNITEC S.p.A. Via Provinciale Cotignola 20/9 I-48022 Lugo, RA / IT | 04 /
PAGANELLI, Rudi Paolo c/o UNITEC S.p.A. Via Provinciale Cotignola 20/9 I-48022 Lugo, RA / IT | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Giugni, Valter Propria S.r.l. Via della Colonna 35 33170 Pordenone / IT | [2014/07] | Application number, filing date | 12710931.2 | 22.03.2012 | [2016/35] | WO2012EP55125 | Priority number, date | IT2011PN00022 | 05.04.2011 Original published format: IT PN20110022 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012136484 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2694943 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2694943 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/40, G01N3/30, G01N33/02 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
G01N3/40 (EP,US);
G01N3/30 (EP,US);
G01N33/025 (EP,US);
G01N2203/001 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0051 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER HÄRTE UND ZUR AUSWAHL VON LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN PRODUKTEN | [2016/25] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE MEASUREMENT OF THE HARDNESS AND FOR THE SELECTION OF AGRICULTURAL PRODUCTS | [2016/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE LA DURETÉ ET DE SÉLECTION DE PRODUITS AGRICOLES | [2016/25] |
Former [2014/07] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER HÄRTE UND ZUR AUSWAHL VON LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN PRODUKTEN | ||
Former [2014/07] | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR THE MEASUREMENT OF THE HARDNESS AND FOR THE SELECTION OF AGRICULTURAL PRODUCTS | ||
Former [2014/07] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MESURE DE LA DURETÉ ET DE SÉLECTION DE PRODUITS AGRICOLES | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 11.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.06.2016 | 27.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.08.2016 | CY | 31.08.2016 | CZ | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | HR | 31.08.2016 | LT | 31.08.2016 | LV | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | MK | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | RS | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | SK | 31.08.2016 | SM | 31.08.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | NO | 30.11.2016 | IS | 31.12.2016 | IE | 22.03.2017 | LU | 22.03.2017 | MT | 22.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | AL | 31.08.2016 | |
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 31.08.2016 | |
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.08.2016 | |
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 31.08.2016 | |
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 31.08.2016 | |
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 22.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 31.08.2016 | |
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 31.08.2016 | |
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 31.08.2016 | |
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 31.08.2016 | |
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/21] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 31.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [I]JPH09236586 (NORIN SUISANSYO TOHOKU NOGYO S, et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0008] , [0015] *; | [I]EP0450716 (PELEG KALMAN [IL]) [I] 1-10 * column 3, line 22 - line 48 * * figure 4 *; | [A]JPH09236587 (UNIV HIROSHIMA, et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0010] *; | [A]EP1107000 (GREEFS WAGEN CARROSSERIE [NL]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0010]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9840737 (IMPERIAL COLLEGE [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * double WO98/52037; page 8, line 10 - line 15; figures 1-3 * * page 11, line 20; figure 5 *; | [A]JPH11183443 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0001] * | [I] - F J GARCÍA-RAMOS ET AL, "Non-destructive fruit firmness sensors: a review", SPANISH JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL RESEARCH, (20050331), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 61 - 73, XP055010877 [I] 1-10 * page 63, column 2, line 7 - line 18 * * figures 4,5 * * page 66, paragraph : Acoustic response to vibration * * page 67, paragraph : Mechanical Vibration * * page 66, column 2, line 11 * | by applicant | WO9429715 | WO9727006 |