EP2676438 - METHOD OF ACQUISITION, STORAGE AND USE OF DATA RELATING TO A THREE-DIMENSIONAL VIDEO STREAM, AND VIDEO PROCESSING APPARATUS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.I.SV.EL. Società Italiana per lo Sviluppo dell'Elettronica S.p.A. Via Sestriere 100 10060 None (TO) / IT | [2013/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DINI, Roberto Via Sestriere 100 I-10060 None (to) / IT | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Camolese, Marco, et al Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 100 10060 None (TO) / IT | [2013/52] | Application number, filing date | 12711234.0 | 13.02.2012 | WO2012IB50644 | Priority number, date | IT2011TO00127 | 15.02.2011 Original published format: IT TO20110127 | [2013/52] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012110938 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2676438 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44, H04N7/26, H04N13/00, H04N21/83, H04N21/44 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/106 (US);
H04N13/156 (EP,US);
H04N13/178 (EP,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
H04N21/433 (KR);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/44 (KR);
H04N21/44008 (EP,US);
H04N21/485 (EP,US);
H04N21/8126 (EP,US);
H04N21/816 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG, SPEICHERUNG UND VERWENDUNG VON DATEN BEZÜGLICH EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN VIDEOSTROMS UND VIDEOVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2013/52] | English: | METHOD OF ACQUISITION, STORAGE AND USE OF DATA RELATING TO A THREE-DIMENSIONAL VIDEO STREAM, AND VIDEO PROCESSING APPARATUS THEREOF | [2013/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACQUISITION, DE STOCKAGE ET D'UTILISATION DE DONNÉES RELATIVES À UN FLUX VIDÉO TRIDIMENSIONNEL ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT VIDÉO ASSOCIÉ | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2013 | Translation filed | 13.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 26.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 29.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6151078 (YONEDA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract ** figures 1-21 *; | [Y]US2002067436 (SHIRAHAMA AKIRA [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3,8-11 * paragraphs [0055] , [0056] , [0074] , [0082] * * figure 4 *; | [A]US2010208750 (KIM YONG-TAE [KR], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [Y]EP2239726 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 6 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * figures 1-11 *; | [XY]WO2010126221 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,12-17 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0146] * * figures 1-11 * [Y] 2,3,6,8-11 |