Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013274277 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213416748 | 09.03.2012 | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | US201313906083 | 30.05.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8497279 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2013 | B2 | US2012232106 | 13.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213416748 | 09.03.2012 | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101802011B | Global Dossier | 27.11.2017 | B1 | KR20140025377 | 04.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6121917B | Global Dossier | 26.04.2017 | B2 | JP2014507480 | 27.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103533938 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2866460 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2021 | C | CA2866460 | 13.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012225367B | Global Dossier | 25.05.2017 | B2 | AU2012225367 | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2683385 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2018 | B1 | EP2683385 | 15.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013023052 | 25.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1120860T | 11.12.2019 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2683385T | 17.09.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA030249 | 31.07.2018 | B1 | EA201391304 | 30.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2686532T | 18.10.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20181286T | 05.10.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP12711500 | 09.03.2012 | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2683385T | 25.10.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX343517 | 07.11.2016 | B | MX2013010308 | 02.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2683385T | 31.12.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12711500 | 09.03.2012 | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS57672 | 30.11.2018 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP12711500 | 09.03.2012 | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2683385T | 30.11.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP12711500 | 09.03.2012 | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | WO2012US28429 | 09.03.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012122452 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE039486T | 28.01.2019 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2683385T | 19.10.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | US201161451531 | 10.03.2011 |