EP2691951 - REDUCED COMPLEXITY TRANSFORM FOR A LOW-FREQUENCY-EFFECTS CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corp. 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2016/45] |
Former [2014/06] | For all designated states Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation 100 Potrero Avenue San Francisco, CA 94103-4813 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELLERS, Matthew C. c/o Dolby Laboratories Inc. 100 Potrero Avenue San Francisco, California 94103-4813 / US | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | Application number, filing date | 12712486.5 | 19.03.2012 | [2016/34] | WO2012US29603 | Priority number, date | US201161468373P | 28.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161468373 P | [2014/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012134851 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2691951 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2691951 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00, G10L19/02, G10L19/008 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
G06F17/147 (EP,US);
G10L19/02 (KR,US);
G10L19/0212 (EP,US);
G10L19/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/06] | G10L19/00, G10L19/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSFORMATION MIT REDUZIERTER KOMPLEXITÄT FÜR EINEN NIEDERFREQUENZEFFEKTKANAL | [2014/06] | English: | REDUCED COMPLEXITY TRANSFORM FOR A LOW-FREQUENCY-EFFECTS CHANNEL | [2014/06] | French: | TRANSFORMATION DE COMPLEXITÉ RÉDUITE POUR CANAL À FAIBLES EFFETS DE FRÉQUENCE | [2014/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 06.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 24.08.2016 | CY | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | HR | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | MK | 24.08.2016 | RS | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | SM | 24.08.2016 | IS | 24.12.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | MT | 19.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | AL | 24.08.2016 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
MT | 19.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 24.08.2016 | |
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
MT | 19.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 24.08.2016 | |
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
MT | 19.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
MT | 19.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | EE | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | EE | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | EE | 24.08.2016 | |
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | HR | 24.08.2016 | |
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | HR | 24.08.2016 | |
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A] - WINNIE LAU ET AL, "A COMMON TRANSFORM ENGINE FOR MPEG & AC3 AUDIO DECODER", 19970801, (19970801), vol. 43, no. 3, pages 559 - 566, XP011083574 [A] 1,6,7 * abstract * * page 559, paragraph [2 MPEG Audio Decoding] - page 560 * * figures 1,2 * | [A] - PRINCEN J P ET AL, "SUBBAND/TRANSFORM CODING USING FILTER BANK DESIGNS BASED ON TIME DOMAIN ALIASING CANCELLATION", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH & SIGNAL PROCESSING. ICASSP. DALLAS, APRIL 6 - 9, 1987; [INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH & SIGNAL PROCESSING. ICASSP], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19870406), vol. 4, pages 2161 - 2164, XP000560572 [A] 1,6,7 * abstract * * page 2161, paragraph [1. Introduction] * * page 2163, paragraph [4. Conclusion] * | [A] - PATRICK DE SMET ET AL, "Optimized MPEG audio decoding using recursive subband synthesis windowing", 2002 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP). ORLANDO, FL, MAY 13 - 17, 2002; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP)], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020513), doi:10.1109/ICASSP.2002.5745320, ISBN 978-0-7803-7402-7, pages III - 3160, XP032015508 [A] 1,6,7 * abstract * * page 3160, paragraph [2. MPEG audio Decoding and subband Synthesis] * * page 3162, paragraph [6. computational Requirements] * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2002.5745320 | by applicant | - PRINCEN; JOHNSON; BRADLEY, "Subband/Trans1orm Coding Using Filter Bank Designs Based on Time Domain Aliasing Cancellation", ICASSP 1987 CONF. PROC., (198705), pages 2161 - 64 |