EP2691035 - MEDICAL DEVICE WITH INTERFERENCE MEMBERS TO PREVENT RE-USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/06] | MEDICAL DEVICE WITH INTERFERENCE MEMBERS TO PREVENT RE -USE | ||
[2022/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith&Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | [2022/22] |
Former [2014/06] | For all designated states Smith&Nephew, Inc. 1450 Brooks Road Memphis, TN 38116 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHENER-IRMAKOGLU, Cemal 37 Sylvanus Wood Lane Woburn, Massachusetts 01801 / US | 02 /
JEZIERSKI, Rafal Z. 143 Boston Street Middleton, Massachusetts 01949 / US | 03 /
LORETH, Brian J. 70 Hill View Road Braintree, Massachusetts 02184 / US | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | White, Andrew John Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2022/22] |
Former [2014/39] | Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO10 5DF / GB | ||
Former [2014/06] | Guy, Mark Robert Smith & Nephew Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO10 5DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 12712833.8 | 26.03.2012 | [2022/22] | WO2012US30506 | Priority number, date | US201113075327 | 30.03.2011 Original published format: US201113075327 | [2014/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012135087 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2691035 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2691035 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32, A61B17/00, // A61B90/00 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
A61B17/32002 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/0057 (RU);
A61B17/00 (KR);
A61B17/32 (KR);
A61B17/34 (KR);
A61B2017/0023 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00575 (RU);
A61B2090/0814 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/06] | A61B17/32, A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES INSTRUMENT MIT INTERFERENZGLIEDER ZUM VERHINDERN VON WIEDERVERWENDUNG | [2022/01] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE WITH INTERFERENCE MEMBERS TO PREVENT RE-USE | [2022/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF MÉDICALE AVEC DES MEMBRES D'INTERFÉRENCE POUR ÉVITER RÉUTILISATION | [2022/01] |
Former [2014/06] | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT STÖRELEMENTEN ZUR VERHINDERUNG EINER WIEDERVERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2014/06] | MEDICAL DEVICE WITH INTERFERENCE MEMBERS TO PREVENT RE -USE | ||
Former [2014/06] | DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL ÉQUIPÉ D'ÉLÉMENTS D'INTERFÉRENCE DESTINÉS À EMPÊCHER UNE RÉUTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 22.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.11.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 02.11.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.06.2022 | AT | 01.06.2022 | CZ | 01.06.2022 | DK | 01.06.2022 | EE | 01.06.2022 | ES | 01.06.2022 | FI | 01.06.2022 | HR | 01.06.2022 | IT | 01.06.2022 | LT | 01.06.2022 | LV | 01.06.2022 | MC | 01.06.2022 | NL | 01.06.2022 | PL | 01.06.2022 | RO | 01.06.2022 | RS | 01.06.2022 | SE | 01.06.2022 | SI | 01.06.2022 | SK | 01.06.2022 | SM | 01.06.2022 | BG | 01.09.2022 | NO | 01.09.2022 | GR | 02.09.2022 | IS | 01.10.2022 | PT | 03.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/48] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5871493 (SJOSTROM DOUGLAS D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9,11-18,21-25 * column 11, lines 12-15; figures 6A, 6B, 7A, 7B * * column 12, lines 6-16 * * column 5, lines 45-49 * [Y] 3,4,6-8,10,19,20; | [A]US2002165549 (OWUSU-AKYAW SAMUEL [US], et al) [A] 6-8,19,20* paragraphs [0088] - [0093]; figures 15-18 *; | [YA]EP1386587 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [Y] 3,4,6-8,10,19,20 * paragraphs [0117] - [0118]; figures 11B-13C * * paragraphs [0098] , [0107]; figures 5A, 5B, 9A * * paragraph [0121] * [A] 9,11,12,21-23 |