|
25.04.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
21.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
21 |
|
13.03.2012 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |