Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013010979 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2013 | A3 | WO2013010979 | 24.01.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP11174628 | 20.07.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9920630 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2018 | B2 | US2014154092 | 05.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11174628 | 20.07.2011 | WO2012EP63890 | 16.07.2012 | EP11161889 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10487662 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2019 | B2 | US2014037455 | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP56521 | 11.04.2012 | EP11161889 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2511477 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2014 | B1 | EP2511477 | 17.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP11174628 | 20.07.2011 | EP11161889 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103958835B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2016 | B | CN103958835 | 30.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP11174628 | 20.07.2011 | WO2012EP63890 | 16.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103703217B | Global Dossier | 04.05.2016 | B | CN103703217 | 02.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP56521 | 11.04.2012 | EP11161889 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2697483 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2016 | B1 | EP2697483 | 19.02.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP12713730 | 11.04.2012 | WO2012EP56521 | 11.04.2012 | EP11161889 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2697483T | 07.11.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP56521 | 11.04.2012 | EP11161889 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012140041 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2012 | A3 | WO2012140041 | 18.10.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP11161889 | 11.04.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2511477T | 01.09.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP11161889 | 11.04.2011 |