EP2697745 - METHOD, CIRCUIT, AND DEVICE FOR CONTACTLESS COMMUNICATION WITH ACTIVATED TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales Dis France SAS 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2022/04] |
Former [2019/36] | For all designated states Thales Dis France SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | ||
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARUANA, Jean-Paul 419 chemin Fabre a Gavet F-83500 La Seyne-sur-Mer / FR | 02 /
BUTON, Christophe 178 Impasse des Cigales Quartier Routelle F-13420 Gemenos / FR | 03 /
CAPOMAGGIO, Grégory 2 rue des Platrières F-13360 Roquevaire / FR | [2014/08] | Representative(s) | Quintero Romero, Manuel, et al Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 12713994.7 | 12.04.2012 | WO2012EP56726 | Priority number, date | EP20110305453 | 15.04.2011 Original published format: EP 11305453 | EP20120305408 | 06.04.2012 Original published format: EP 12305408 | [2014/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012140169 | Date: | 18.10.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2697745 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, G06K19/077 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
G06K19/07773 (EP,US);
H04B7/028 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SCHALTUNG UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTAKTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATION MIT AKTIVIERTER ÜBERTRAGUNG | [2014/08] | English: | METHOD, CIRCUIT, AND DEVICE FOR CONTACTLESS COMMUNICATION WITH ACTIVATED TRANSMISSION | [2014/08] | French: | PROCEDE, CIRCUIT ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS CONTACT A EMISSION ACTIVEE | [2014/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 30.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2020 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.12.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5621913 (TUTTLE MARK E [US], et al); | [A]US6356535 (SMITH FREDDIE W [US]); | [XI]EP1898342 (MOBILE TECHNICS LLC [US]) | by applicant | EP0926855 | EP1898342 | EP1801741 |