EP2663761 - ABNORMALITY DETECTION APPARATUS AND ABNORMALITY DETECTION METHOD FOR RANKINE CYCLE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Yoshiyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12714041.6 | 16.02.2012 | [2017/12] | WO2012IB00340 | Priority number, date | JP20110032281 | 17.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011032281 | [2013/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012110893 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2663761 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2663761 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F02G5/02, F01P3/22, F01P5/14 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
F01P3/22 (EP,US);
G01M15/04 (US);
F01P3/2285 (EP,US);
F01P5/14 (EP,US);
F02G5/02 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEHLERERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND FEHLERERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN RANKINE-ZYKLUSSYSTEM | [2013/47] | English: | ABNORMALITY DETECTION APPARATUS AND ABNORMALITY DETECTION METHOD FOR RANKINE CYCLE SYSTEM | [2013/47] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'ANOMALIE POUR SYSTÈME À CYCLE DE RANKINE | [2013/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 25.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.04.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2012 | AL | 22.03.2017 | AT | 22.03.2017 | CY | 22.03.2017 | CZ | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | EE | 22.03.2017 | ES | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | HR | 22.03.2017 | IT | 22.03.2017 | LT | 22.03.2017 | LV | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | MK | 22.03.2017 | NL | 22.03.2017 | PL | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | RS | 22.03.2017 | SE | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | SM | 22.03.2017 | TR | 22.03.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | NO | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | IS | 22.07.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 16.02.2012 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MK | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
TR | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 16.02.2012 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
TR | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
TR | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4069672 (MILLING ROBERT W) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006254276 (SATO AKIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009133619 (SANDEN CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010101224 (KASUYA JUNICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,6* the whole document *; | [A]US2010205959 (KASUYA JUNICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2006017108 | JP2008169760 | JP2009079505 | JP2010174848 |