EP2715699 - DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUELSEN, Michael Augustenstr. 56 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/15] | Application number, filing date | 12714996.1 | 02.04.2012 | WO2012EP55963 | Priority number, date | DE20111076763 | 31.05.2011 Original published format: DE102011076763 | [2014/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012163573 | Date: | 06.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2715699 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2715699 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, G08G1/0962, G06F17/30 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
G08G1/166 (EP,US);
G08G1/09626 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRERASSISTENZSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES FAHRERASSISTENZSYSTEMS | [2014/15] | English: | DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRIVER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM | [2014/15] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE AU CONDUCTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE AU CONDUCTEUR | [2014/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 10.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE Opponent's representative DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE Opponent's representative DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB St.-Anna-Strasse 15 80538 München / DE | 04.12.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.06.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.05.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/43] | 07.06.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2012 | AL | 28.01.2015 | CY | 28.01.2015 | CZ | 28.01.2015 | DK | 28.01.2015 | EE | 28.01.2015 | ES | 28.01.2015 | FI | 28.01.2015 | HR | 28.01.2015 | IT | 28.01.2015 | LT | 28.01.2015 | LV | 28.01.2015 | MC | 28.01.2015 | MT | 28.01.2015 | NL | 28.01.2015 | PL | 28.01.2015 | RO | 28.01.2015 | RS | 28.01.2015 | SI | 28.01.2015 | SK | 28.01.2015 | SM | 28.01.2015 | TR | 28.01.2015 | IE | 02.04.2015 | LU | 02.04.2015 | BG | 28.04.2015 | NO | 28.04.2015 | GR | 29.04.2015 | BE | 30.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | IS | 28.05.2015 | PT | 28.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 02.04.2012 | |
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
PT | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
IE | 02.04.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
LU | 02.04.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 28.01.2015 | |
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RS | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 28.01.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1085295 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1,4,5,8 * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 52; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1607924 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1,4,5,8 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 55; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE102005020429 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 1,4,5,8 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0024]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2011040796 (SHOCKRO JOHN J [US], et al) [Y] 1,4,5,8 * paragraph [0034] ** paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044]; figure 2A * |