Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013149653 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP56066 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10124384 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2018 | B2 | US2015129556 | 14.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP56066 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101893545B | Global Dossier | 30.08.2018 | B1 | KR20140143199 | 15.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP56066 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5788625B | Global Dossier | 07.10.2015 | B2 | JP2015512339 | 27.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP56066 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104220184B | Global Dossier | 05.10.2016 | B | CN104220184 | 17.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP56066 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2834022 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2016 | B1 | EP2834022 | 11.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP56066 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2574183T | 15.06.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP56066 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE029134T | 28.02.2017 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP12715016 | 03.04.2012 | WO2012EP56066 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2834022T | 31.08.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP56066 | 03.04.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2834022E | 03.06.2016 | E | Priority number | Date | WO2012EP56066 | 03.04.2012 |