Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101569669B | Global Dossier | 17.11.2015 | B1 | KR20130130849 | 02.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161447760 | 01.03.2011 | US201113173977 | 30.06.2011 | WO2012US27337 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5745106B | Global Dossier | 08.07.2015 | B2 | JP2014511576 | 15.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161447760 | 01.03.2011 | US201113173977 | 30.06.2011 | WO2012US27337 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103430309B | Global Dossier | 31.08.2016 | B | CN103430309 | 04.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161447760 | 01.03.2011 | US201113173977 | 30.06.2011 | WO2012US27337 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2681766 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2019 | B1 | EP2681766 | 08.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161447760 | 01.03.2011 | US201113173977 | 30.06.2011 | WO2012US27337 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013022264 | 14.09.2021 | B1 | BR112013022264 | 06.12.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161447760 | 01.03.2011 | US201113173977 | 30.06.2011 | WO2012US27337 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2747174T | 10.03.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201161447760 | 01.03.2011 | US201113173977 | 30.06.2011 | WO2012US27337 | 01.03.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012119003 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161447760 | 01.03.2011 | US201113173977 | 30.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8531806 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2013 | B2 | US2012224284 | 06.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161447760 | 01.03.2011 | US201113173977 | 30.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE045396T | 30.12.2019 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201161447760 | 01.03.2011 | US201113173977 | 30.06.2011 |