EP2689506 - DOMESTIC APPLIANCE WITH PROTECTION CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2014/05] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRÖDER, Bernd Suite C-1702, Regal International Guangzhou Lu NO 5 Nanjing, 210008 / CN | [2014/49] |
Former [2014/05] | 01 /
SCHRÖDER, Bernd Suite C-1702, Regal International, Lu NO 5 Guangzhou, Nanjing 210008 / CN | Application number, filing date | 12715635.4 | 22.03.2012 | WO2012EP55134 | Priority number, date | CN20111075863 | 22.03.2011 Original published format: CN201110075863 | CN20121074433 | 12.03.2012 Original published format: CN201210074433 | [2014/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012127007 | Date: | 27.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2689506 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2689506 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02H1/00, H02H3/04, H02H11/00 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
H02H11/001 (EP);
H02H1/0084 (EP);
H02H3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAUSGERÄT MIT SCHUTZSCHALTUNG | [2014/05] | English: | DOMESTIC APPLIANCE WITH PROTECTION CIRCUIT | [2014/05] | French: | APPAREIL MÉNAGER À CIRCUIT DE PROTECTION | [2014/05] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 20.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2012 | AL | 13.05.2015 | CY | 13.05.2015 | CZ | 13.05.2015 | DK | 13.05.2015 | EE | 13.05.2015 | FI | 13.05.2015 | HR | 13.05.2015 | LT | 13.05.2015 | LV | 13.05.2015 | MC | 13.05.2015 | MK | 13.05.2015 | MT | 13.05.2015 | NL | 13.05.2015 | PL | 13.05.2015 | RO | 13.05.2015 | RS | 13.05.2015 | SE | 13.05.2015 | SI | 13.05.2015 | SK | 13.05.2015 | SM | 13.05.2015 | BG | 13.08.2015 | NO | 13.08.2015 | GR | 14.08.2015 | IS | 13.09.2015 | PT | 14.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.03.2012 | |
CY | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MK | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
NL | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
SM | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
NL | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 13.05.2015 | |
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 13.05.2015 | |
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 13.05.2015 | |
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4843514 (BODKIN LAWRENCE E [US]) [A] 1,11* column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 42; figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB2242084 (BICC PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US6057996 (KIM JUNGMOO [KR]) [A] 1,8,10-12 * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 3; claims 1,8,9,12,16-18 * * column 8, line 9 - column 9, line 22 * * abstract *; | [A]WO2007092815 (LEVITON MANUFATURING CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 2; figures 1-3; claims 12,13,18 * * page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 4 *; | [A]US2009212967 (BONASIA GAETANO [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |