EP2697588 - REFRIGERANT CONDENSER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstr. 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FÖRSTER, Uwe Sommerhaldenstraße 17 71729 Erdmannhausen / DE | 02 /
GUILLAUME, David Stubaierstraße 3 70327 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
HOFMANN, Herbert Lämmleshalde 43 70376 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
KASPAR, Martin Bruckstraße 33 70734 Fellbach / DE | 05 /
WALTER, Christoph Werner-Haas-Weg 32 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/08] | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Wartbergstrasse 14 70191 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | Grauel, Andreas Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Presselstrasse 10 70191 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12715677.6 | 12.04.2012 | WO2012EP56641 | Priority number, date | DE20111007216 | 12.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011007216 | [2014/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012140116 | Date: | 18.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2697588 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/053 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
F28D1/05375 (EP);
F25B39/04 (EP);
F28F9/0209 (EP);
F28F9/0243 (EP);
F25B2339/0441 (EP);
F28D2021/0084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/08] | Title | German: | KÄLTEMITTELKONDENSATORBAUGRUPPE | [2014/08] | English: | REFRIGERANT CONDENSER ASSEMBLY | [2014/08] | French: | MODULE DE CONDENSATEUR DE FLUIDE RÉFRIGÉRANT | [2014/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 23.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 11.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4972683 (BEATENBOUGH PAUL K [US]) [X] 1,4,6,8-10 * column 3, line 17 - line 31 * * column 4, line 37 - line 57; figure 4 * [I] 2; | [XI]EP1310760 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6-9 * the whole document * [I] 2,3,5; | [XD]EP0479775 (SHOWA ALUMINIUM CO LTD [JP]) [XD] 8 * the whole document * * sentence 1, paragraph 1 - sentence 3 *; | [X]DE10122360 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,8-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043]; figure 1 *; | [XI]JPH0387572 (NIPPON DENSO CO) [X] 1,4,6,8-10 * abstract * [I] 2,3,5,7 | Examination | DE4238853 | by applicant | EP0479775 | DE69600580T |