EP2702086 - SEMICONDUCTOR MATERIALS BASED ON DIKETOPIPERIDINOPIPERIDINE COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISHRA, Ashok Kumar 17-331, 161 Mei Ling Street Singapore 140161 / SG | 02 /
VAIDYANATHAN, Subramanian Hochbergerstrasse 76 CH-4057 Basel / CH | 03 /
NOGUCHI, Hiroyoshi 66B Telok Blangah Rd, 07-15 Singapore 098830 / SG | 04 /
DÖTZ, Florian 206 Ocean Drive, 04-07 Singapore 098627 / SG | 05 /
GUAN, Yucui Holland close 3A, 08-67 Singapore 272003 / SG | [2014/10] | Representative(s) | Bernhardt, Wolfgang Willy-Hans BASF Schweiz AG FLP/P-R1059.7.55 Mattenstrasse 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Bernhardt, Wolfgang Willy-Hans BASF Schweiz AG IP Department P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 12716040.6 | 24.04.2012 | WO2012EP57438 | Priority number, date | US201161479872P | 28.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161479872 P | EP20110164088 | 28.04.2011 Original published format: EP 11164088 | [2014/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012146574 | Date: | 01.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2702086 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2702086 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/12 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
C08G61/126 (EP);
C08G61/12 (KR);
C08L65/00 (KR);
C09B57/00 (EP);
C09B69/109 (EP);
H10K99/00 (KR);
C08G2261/124 (EP);
C08G2261/1412 (EP);
C08G2261/3223 (EP);
C08G2261/3243 (EP);
C08G2261/344 (EP);
C08G2261/414 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERMATERIALIEN BASIEREND AUF DIKETOPIPERIDIN-COPOLYMEREN | [2014/10] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR MATERIALS BASED ON DIKETOPIPERIDINOPIPERIDINE COPOLYMERS | [2014/10] | French: | MATÉRIAUX SEMI-CONDUCTEURS BASÉS SUR DES COPOLYMÈRES DE DICÉTOPIPÉRIDINOPIPÉRIDINE | [2014/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 30.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2012 | AL | 18.03.2015 | AT | 18.03.2015 | BE | 18.03.2015 | BG | 18.03.2015 | CY | 18.03.2015 | CZ | 18.03.2015 | DK | 18.03.2015 | EE | 18.03.2015 | ES | 18.03.2015 | FI | 18.03.2015 | HR | 18.03.2015 | LT | 18.03.2015 | LV | 18.03.2015 | MC | 18.03.2015 | MK | 18.03.2015 | MT | 18.03.2015 | NL | 18.03.2015 | PL | 18.03.2015 | RO | 18.03.2015 | RS | 18.03.2015 | SE | 18.03.2015 | SI | 18.03.2015 | SK | 18.03.2015 | SM | 18.03.2015 | TR | 18.03.2015 | IE | 24.04.2015 | LU | 24.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | NO | 18.06.2015 | GR | 19.06.2015 | IS | 18.07.2015 | PT | 20.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.04.2012 | |
AT | 18.03.2015 | ||
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MK | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 24.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 24.04.2012 | |
AT | 18.03.2015 | ||
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 24.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 24.04.2012 | |
AT | 18.03.2015 | ||
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 24.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 24.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 24.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 24.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.03.2015 | |
NO | 18.06.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005090640 (HEENEY MARTIN [GB], et al); | [A]EP2034537 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]WO2009105042 (UNIV NANYANG [SG], et al); | [A]WO2009123695 (CORNING INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2010108873 (BASF SE [DE], et al) |