EP2689412 - AUTHENTICATING LABEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avery Dennison Corporation 150 North Orange Grove Blvd. Pasadena, CA 91103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | For all designated states Avery Dennison Corporation 150 North Orange Grove Bvld. Pasadena, CA 91103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUYNH, Dieu, Dai 11 Villa Des Arcades F-91080 Courcouronnes / FR | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/05] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12716156.0 | 26.03.2012 | WO2012US30504 | Priority number, date | US201161467540P | 25.03.2011 Original published format: US 201161467540 P | [2014/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012135085 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2689412 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/02, G09F3/10 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
G09F3/10 (EP,KR,US);
G09F3/02 (KR);
G09F3/0294 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/05] | Title | German: | AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSETIKETT | [2014/05] | English: | AUTHENTICATING LABEL | [2014/05] | French: | ÉTIQUETTE D'IDENTIFICATION | [2014/05] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 15.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/47] | 15.05.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 23.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2014/47] | 23.06.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH1138880 (LINTEC CORP) [X] 1,9* abstract *; | [X]US6592972 (TRANTOUL FRANCOIS [FR]) [X] 1-35 * column 1, line 5 - line 26 * * column 11, line 34 - column 14, line 37 * * figure 11 *; | [X]US2004245763 (TRANTOUL FRANCOIS [FR]) [X] 1-35 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0110] * * figures 1-6 * | by applicant | US4865937 | US5256192 | US5623011 | US5728469 | US5830571 | US6147165 | US6486267 | US2002195586 | US2003000530 | US2003041774 | US6554480 | US2005074549 | US2007225402 | US7473437 | US2010143578 |