EP2697345 - A PROCESS FOR THE ISOLATION OF A PHOSPHOLIPID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polar Omega A/S Læssevejen 20 6700 Esbjerg / DK | [2014/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOERENSEN, Hans Otto Egedesmindevej 87 DK-6715 Esbjerg N. / DK | 02 /
JENSEN, Nils Christian Funders Alle 9 DK-6740 Bramming / DK | [2014/08] | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2014/08] | Heebøll-Nielsen, Anders, et al Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 12717168.4 | 13.04.2012 | [2016/12] | WO2012DK50124 | Priority number, date | EP20110162366 | 14.04.2011 Original published format: EP 11162366 | [2014/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012139588 | Date: | 18.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2697345 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2697345 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C11B1/10, C11B3/00, A23D9/00, A23J1/04, A23J7/00, A23L33/115, A23L17/10 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
A23D9/00 (EP,US);
C11B7/0025 (US);
A23D9/04 (EP,US);
A23J7/00 (EP,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
C11B1/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/34] | C11B1/10, C11B3/00, A23D9/00, A23D9/04, A23J1/04, A23J7/00, A23L1/326, A23L1/30 | ||
Former IPC [2014/08] | C11B1/10, C11B3/00, A23D9/04, A23J1/04, A23J7/00, A23L1/326, A23L1/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG EINES PHOSPHOLIPIDS | [2014/08] | English: | A PROCESS FOR THE ISOLATION OF A PHOSPHOLIPID | [2014/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR L'ISOLEMENT D'UN PHOSPHOLIPIDE | [2014/08] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 23.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2012 | AL | 23.03.2016 | AT | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | RS | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | SM | 23.03.2016 | LU | 13.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 13.04.2012 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 13.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 13.04.2012 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
RS | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | RS | 23.03.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB414717 (ALPHONSO THOMAS ARCHIBALD DOUG) [X] 34,35 * example -; claim - *; | [ID]US4584141 (PAULITZ BERNHARD G A [DE], et al) [ID] 1-36 * example -; claims 1,2,5,9,14,15,18,25 *; | [ID]EP0269277 (CAMBRIAN ENG GROUP LTD [CA]) [ID] 1-36* page 3, line 34 - line 41; claims 1,8,11,12,20,22 *; | [ID]US6172247 (COPELAND DICK [US], et al) [ID] 1-36 * column 14, line 25 - line 56; figure 2 *; | [XDI]US2005129739 (KOHN GERHARD [DE], et al) [XD] 1,2,8,9,11,31-33,36 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0041] * [I] 3-7,10,12-30,34,35; | [ID]US2006110521 (HEISE JERALD D [US], et al) [ID] 1-36 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0088] *; | [XI]GB2462054 (STATOILHYDRO ASA [NO]) [X] 1,2,8,9,11,31-33,36 * page 13, line 27 - page 14, line 25; example 1 * [I] 3-7,10,12-30,34,35 | by applicant | US4584141 | EP0269277 | WO0023456 | US6172247 | WO0176385 | US6372460 | WO03011873 | US2005129739 | US2006110521 | WO2006106325 | JP2006311853 | JP2008044907 | JP2008255182 |