EP2691076 - USNIC ACID TOPICAL FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Integumen Ireland Limited 19 Railway Road Dalkey Dublin / IE | [2018/17] |
Former [2016/29] | For all designated states Innovenn Limited 19 Railway Road Dalkey Dublin / IE | ||
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states Venn Life Sciences Holdings plc 4 Lombard Street London EC3V 9HD / GB | ||
Former [2014/06] | For all designated states Evocutis plc Sandbeck Lane Wetherby West Yorkshire LS22 7TW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABBOTT, Steven John c/o Evocutis plc Sandbeck Lane Wetherby, Yorkshire LS22 7TW / GB | 02 /
DONOGHUE, Gavin c/o Evocutis plc Sandbeck Lane Wetherby, Yorkshire LS22 7TW / GB | 03 /
EADY, Elizabeth Anne c/o Evocutis plc Sandbeck Lane Wetherby, Yorkshire LS22 7TW / GB | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | Glansdorp, Freija Gwendolyn, et al Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 12717446.4 | 26.03.2012 | WO2012GB50664 | Priority number, date | GB20110005410 | 31.03.2011 Original published format: GB 201105410 | GB20110011013 | 29.06.2011 Original published format: GB 201111013 | [2014/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012131347 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2691076 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K47/14, A61K47/26, A61K31/34, A61K31/60, A61P17/10 | [2014/06] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K47/22 (US);
A61K31/343 (EP,US);
A61K31/60 (EP,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61P17/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/343, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/60, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Title | German: | TOPISCHE USNINSÄUREFORMULIERUNG | [2014/06] | English: | USNIC ACID TOPICAL FORMULATION | [2014/06] | French: | FORMULATIONS TOPIQUES D'ACIDE USNIQUE | [2014/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 28.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/24] | 21.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006269485 (FRIEDMAN DORON [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2008194518 (MOOKERJEE PRADIP [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 18; table 2 * * paragraphs [0122] , [0129] * * claims 1,14 *; | [IP]WO2011055139 (SYNTOPIX GROUP PLC [GB], et al) [IP] 1-15* examples 14,15 * | by applicant | - WALLER JM; DREHER F; BEHNAM S; FORD C; LEE C; TIET T; WEINSTEIN GD; MAIBACH HI, "Keratolytic' properties of benzoyl peroxide and retinoic acid resemble salicylic acid in man", SKIN PHARMACOL PHYSIOL, (2006), vol. 19, pages 283 - 9 | - NICOLAIDES N, "Skin Lipids - Their Biochemical Uniqueness", SCIENCE, (1974), vol. 186, pages 19 - 26 | - WILLIAMSON P; KLIGMAN AM, "A New Method for the Quantitative Investigation of Cutaneous Bacteria", J INVEST DERMATOL, (196512), vol. 45, no. 6, pages 498 - 503 | - HOLLAND KT; ROBERTS CD, "A technique for sampling micro-organisms from the pilo-sebaceous ducts", JAPPL BACTERIOL, (1974), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 289 - 96 | - WILKINSON DS; FREGERT S; MAGNUSSON B; BANDMANN HJ; CALNAN CD; CRONIN E; HJORTH N; MAIBACH HJ; MALALTEN KE; MENEGHINI CL, "Terminology of contact dermatitis", ACTA DERM VENEREOL, (1970), vol. 50, no. 4, pages 287 - 92 |