EP2699338 - ALKYLARYL SULPHONATE COMPOSITIONS AND USE THEREOF FOR THE ENHANCED RECOVERY OF HYDROCARBONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Total SA 2 place Jean Millier La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2014/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURREL, Maurice 26 rue Montijo 64000 Pau / FR | 02 /
CHAMEROIS, Manuel 11 impasse du Moulin 64230 Denguin / FR | 03 /
AGENET, Nicolas 150 Chemin de Laotage 64300 Bonnut / FR | [2014/09] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12718120.4 | 13.04.2012 | WO2012EP56857 | Priority number, date | FR20110053360 | 18.04.2011 Original published format: FR 1153360 | [2014/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012143306 | Date: | 26.10.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2699338 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01F17/00, C09K8/584 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
C09K8/584 (EP,US);
C09K23/017 (EP,US);
C09K23/12 (EP,US);
E21B43/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/09] | Title | German: | ALKYLARYLSULFONATZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR VERSTÄRKTEN RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN | [2014/09] | English: | ALKYLARYL SULPHONATE COMPOSITIONS AND USE THEREOF FOR THE ENHANCED RECOVERY OF HYDROCARBONS | [2014/09] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ALKYLARYLSULFONATES ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LA RECUPERATION ASSISTEE D'HYDROCARBURES | [2014/09] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 29.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1021427 (CONTINENTAL OIL CO) [X] 1,5-9 * page 2, line 8 - line 65 * * page 2, line 88 - line 91 * * claims 1-11 *; | [A]EP0111354 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1,15,16 * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 7 * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 5 * * page 5, line 21 - line 32 ** page 8, line 16 - page 10, line 12 *; | [XDY]US6269881 (CHOU SHANG [US], et al) [XD] 1,11,13,14 * column 1, line 31 - line 52 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 20 * * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 34 * * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 13 * [Y] 16-18; | [IY]US2008113884 (CAMPBELL CURT B [US], et al) [I] 1,13,15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0095] * * page 2, line 8 - line 66; example 8; claim 16 * [Y] 16-18; | [I]US2011046024 (CAMPBELL CURTIS BAY [US], et al) [I] 1,5,7,13-15,20 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0150] * * paragraph [0168] * | by applicant | US3601198 | US4452708 | EP0111354 | EP0148517 | EP0158486 | US4608204 | FR2589858 | US4682653 | US4690785 | US4873025 | US4932473 | EP0413374 | US6043391 | US6269881 | WO0198432 | WO2005018300 | - "Some physicochemical aspects of microemulsion floodings: a review", VOIR REED R. L.; HEALY, R. N., Improved Oil Recovery by Surfactant and Polymer Flooding, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1977), pages 383 - 437 |