EP2695186 - HETEROGENEOUS INTEGRATION OF GROUP III-V OR II-VI MATERIALS WITH SILICON OR GERMANIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.05.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxford University Innovation Limited Buxton Court 3 West Way Botley Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [2017/10] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Oxford University Innovation Limited Buxton Court 3 West Way Botley Oxford OX2 0SZ / GB | ||
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states Isis Innovation Limited Ewert House Ewert Place Summertown, Oxford OX2 7SQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSHAW, Peter Department of Materials University of Oxford Parks Road Oxford, Oxfordshire OX1 3PH / GB | 02 /
MALLIK, Kanad Department of Materials University of Oxford Parks Road Oxford, Oxfordshire OX1 3PH / GB | 03 /
JORDAN, Doug 22 Widford Road Chelmsford, Essex CM2 9AR / GB | 04 /
DE GROOT, Cornelis School of Electronics and Computer Science University of Southampton Southampton SO17 1BJ / GB | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Forsythe, Dominic J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12718735.9 | 04.04.2012 | WO2012GB50758 | Priority number, date | GB20110005862 | 06.04.2011 Original published format: GB 201105862 | GB20110005859 | 06.04.2011 Original published format: GB 201105859 | GB20110005857 | 06.04.2011 Original published format: GB 201105857 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012136998 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2695186 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/26, H01L21/265 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
H01L21/2605 (EP,US);
H01L21/225 (US);
H01L21/02381 (US);
H01L21/22 (US);
H01L21/26506 (EP,US);
H01L21/3225 (US);
H01L21/3226 (EP,US);
H01L21/324 (US);
H01L29/16 (US);
H01L29/2003 (US);
H01L29/225 (US);
H01L29/267 (US);
H01L29/36 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Title | German: | HETEROGENE INTEGRATION VON GRUPPE-III-V- ODER II-VI-MATERIALIEN MIT SILIZIUM ODER GERMANIUM | [2014/07] | English: | HETEROGENEOUS INTEGRATION OF GROUP III-V OR II-VI MATERIALS WITH SILICON OR GERMANIUM | [2014/07] | French: | INTÉGRATION HÉTÉROGÈNE DE MATÉRIAUX DU GROUPE III-V OU II-VI AVEC DU SILICIUM OU DU GERMANIUM | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 06.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.05.2018 | 15.05.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/48] | 02.10.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/48] | Appeal following examination | 17.07.2018 | Appeal received No. T2543/18 | 02.10.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.11.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 13.11.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.2015 | 30.04.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y] - YU B BOLKHOVITYANOV, "GaAs epitaxy on Si substrates: modern status of research and engineering", PHYSICS - USPEKHI, (20080101), vol. 51, no. 5, doi:10.1070/PU2008v051n05ABEH006529, pages 437 - 456, XP055029663 [Y] 1-21 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1070/PU2008v051n05ABEH006529 | [Y] - ABUELGASIM A ET AL, "FAST TRACK COMMUNICATION;Reduced microwave attenuation in coplanar waveguides using deep level impurity compensated Czochralski-silicon substrates;Fast Track Communication", SEMICONDUCTOR SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (20110331), vol. 26, no. 7, doi:10.1088/0268-1242/26/7/072001, ISSN 0268-1242, page 72001, XP020206519 [Y] 1-21 * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0268-1242/26/7/072001 | [A] - WANG R ET AL, "Semi-insulating silicon substrates for silicon based RF integrated circuits", SILICON MONOLITHIC INTEGRATED CIRCUITS IN RF SYSTEMS, 1998. DIGEST OF PAPERS. 1998 TOPICAL MEETING ON ANN ARBOR, MI, USA 17-18 SEPT. 1998, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19980917), doi:10.1109/SMIC.1998.750213, ISBN 978-0-7803-5288-9, pages 164 - 168, XP010324584 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SMIC.1998.750213 | Examination | US2007278574 | WO2009034362 | by applicant | WO2009034362 | - SEMICOND. SCI. TECHNOL., (2003), vol. 18, pages 517 - 524 | - K. MALLIK; R.J. FALSTER; P.R. WILSHAW, SEMICONDUCTOR SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 18, page 517 |