EP2694496 - 3- OR 5-BIPHENYL-4-YLISOXAZOLE-BASED COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF FIBROSIS, PAIN , CANCER AND RESPIRATORY, ALLERGIC, NERVOUS SYSTEM OR CARDIOVASCULAR DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/07] | 3- OR 5 - BI PHENYL - 4 - YLISOXAZOLE - BASED COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF FIBROSIS, PAIN, CANCER AND RESPIRATORY, ALLERGIC, NERVOUS SYSTEM OR CARDIOVASCULAR DISORDERS | ||
[2017/27] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amira Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Route 206 & Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIDERS, Thomas, Jon 5257 Soledad Mountain Road San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 02 /
ROPPE, Jeffrey, Roger 45004 Oakford Ct Temecula, CA 92592 / US | 03 /
PARR, Timothy, Andrew 8504 Lemon Avenue La Mesa, CA 91941 / US | [2014/19] |
Former [2014/07] | 01 /
SEIDERS, Thomas, Jon 5257 Soledad Mountain Road San Diego, CA 92109 / US | ||
02 /
ROPPE, Jeffrey, Roger 32182 Camino Guarda Temecula, CA 92592 / US | |||
03 /
PARR, Timothy, Andrew 8504 Lemon Avenue La Mesa, CA 91941 / US | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12718774.8 | 04.04.2012 | WO2012US32222 | Priority number, date | US201161472100P | 05.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161472100 P | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012138797 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2694496 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/12, A61K31/4439, A61P9/10, A61P11/06, A61P17/02, A61P25/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/08 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
C07D413/12 (EP,CN,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Title | German: | ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FIBROSE, SCHMERZEN, KREBS, ALLERGIEN UND ERKRANKUNGEN DER ATEMWEGE, DES NERVENSYSTEMS ODER DES HERZKREISLAUFSYSTEMS GEEIGNETE AUF 3- ODER 5-BIPHENYL-4-YLISOXAZOL BASIERENDE VERBINDUNGEN | [2017/31] | English: | 3- OR 5-BIPHENYL-4-YLISOXAZOLE-BASED COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF FIBROSIS, PAIN , CANCER AND RESPIRATORY, ALLERGIC, NERVOUS SYSTEM OR CARDIOVASCULAR DISORDERS | [2017/27] | French: | COMPOSES A BASE DE 3- OU 5-BIPHENYL-4-YLISOXAZOLE UTILES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA FIBROSE, DE LA DOULEUR, DU CANCER, DE TROUBLES RESPIRATOIRES OU DU SYSTEME NERVEUX CENTRAL ET DE MALADIES ALLERGIQUES OU CARDIOVASCULAIRES | [2017/31] |
Former [2014/07] | 3-ODER 5 - BIPHENYL- 4 - YLISOXAZOL -BASIERTE VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FIBROSE, SCHMERZEN, KREBS, ATEMWEGSERKRANKUNGEN, ALLERGIEN, DES NERVENSYSTEMS ODER VON KARDIOVASKULÄREN ERKRANKUNGEN | ||
Former [2014/07] | 3- OR 5 - BI PHENYL - 4 - YLISOXAZOLE - BASED COMPOUNDS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF FIBROSIS, PAIN, CANCER AND RESPIRATORY, ALLERGIC, NERVOUS SYSTEM OR CARDIOVASCULAR DISORDERS | ||
Former [2014/07] | COMPOSÉS À BASE DE 3- OU 5-BIPHÉNYL-4-YLISOXAZOLE UTILES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA FIBROSE, DE LA DOULEUR, DU CANCER ET DE TROUBLES RESPIRATOIRES, ALLERGIQUES, DE TROUBLES DU SYSTÈME NERVEUX OU DE TROUBLES CARDIOVASCULAIRES | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 22.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 09.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2007225285 (HUTCHINSON JOHN H [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 9 * * page 149 - page 150; table 5 * | by applicant | WO02062389 | US4229447 | US4596795 | US4755386 | US5739136 | US7060697 | EP0079157 | US2007225285 | US2007219206 | US2007173508 | US2007123522 | US2007105866 | US2007149579 | WO2007016784 | - CHOI ET AL., BIOCHEMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (2008), vol. 1781, pages 531 - 539 | - MILLS ET AL., NAT REV. CANCER, (2003), vol. 3, pages 582 - 591 | - J.P. PRADCRC ET AL., "LPA, receptor activation promotes renal interstitial fibrosis", J. AM. SOC. NEPHROL., (2007), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1681/ASN.2007020196, pages 3110 - 3118, XP002682319 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1681/ASN.2007020196 | - N. WIEDMAIER ET AL., INTJMED MICROBIOL, (2008), vol. 298, no. 3-4, pages 231 - 43 | - A. KANTARCI ET AL., J. PATHOL., (2006), vol. 210, pages 59 - 66 | - N. WATANABE ET AL., "Plasma lysophosphatidic acid level and serum autotaxin activity are increased in liver injury in rats in relation to its severity", LIFE SCI., (2007), vol. 81, doi:doi:10.1016/j.lfs.2007.08.013, pages 1009 - 1015, XP022248228 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.lfs.2007.08.013 | - N.WATANABE ET AL., J. CLIN. GASTROENTEROL., (2007), vol. 41, pages 616 - 623 | - K. KURODA ET AL., "Phospholipid concentration in lung lavage fluid as biomarker for pulmonary fibrosis", INHAL. TOXICOL., (2006), vol. 18, pages 389 - 393 | - K. YASUDA ET AL., LUNG, (1994), vol. 172, pages 91 - 102 | - CHEN ET AL., FEBS LETT., (20060821), vol. 580, no. 19, pages 4737 - 45 | - TAGER ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (2008), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 45 - 54 | - MUNGER ET AL., CELL, (1999), vol. 96, pages 319 - 328 | - XU ET AL., AM. J. PATHOLOGY, (2009), vol. 174, no. 2, pages 1264 - 1279 | - C.N. INOUE ET AL., CLIN. SCI. (COLCH., (1999), vol. 96, pages 431 - 436 | - J.S. KOH, J CLIN. INVEST., (1998), vol. 102, pages 716 - 727 | - M. INOUE ET AL., "Initiation of neuropathic pain requires lysophosphatidic acid receptor signaling", NAT. MED., (2004), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1038/nm1060, pages 712 - 718, XP002693859 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm1060 | - MOL CANCER THER, (2008), vol. 7, no. 10, pages 3352 - 62 | - GARDELL ET AL., TRENDS IN MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (2006), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 65 - 75 | - ISHII ET AL., ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM, (2004), vol. 73, pages 321 - 354 | - MILLS ET AL., NAT. REV. CANCER, (2003), vol. 3, pages 582 - 591 | - MURPH ET AL., BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (2008), vol. 1781, pages 547 - 557 | - YAMADA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, pages 6595 - 6605 | - YAMADA, CANCER SCI., (2008), vol. 99, no. 8, pages 1603 - 1610 | - BOUCHARABA ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2004), vol. 114, no. 12, pages 1714 - 1725 | - BOUCHARABA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2006), vol. 103, no. 25, pages 9643 - 9648 | - MILLS ET AL., NAT. REV. CANCER., (2003), vol. 3, pages 582 - 591 | - SUTPHEN ET AL., CANCER EPIDEMIOL. BIOMARKERS PREV., (2004), vol. 13, pages 1185 - 1191 | - J.J.A. CONTOS ET AL., MOL. PHARMACOL., (2000), vol. 58, pages 1188 - 1196 | - M. AMISHIMA ET AL., AM. J. RESPIR. CRIT. CARE MED., (1998), vol. 157, pages 1907 - 1912 | - EDIGER ET AL., EUR RESPIR .J, (2003), vol. 21, pages 759 - 769 | - HASHIMOTO ET AL., JPHARMACOL SCI, (2006), vol. 100, pages 82 - 87 | - MOOLENAAR, CURR. OPIN. CELL BIOL., (1995), vol. 7, pages 203 - 10 | - J. NEUROCHEM., (1993), vol. 61, page 340 | - J. NEUROCHEM., (1998), vol. 70, page 66 | - ISHII, I. ET AL., ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (2004), vol. 73, pages 321 - 354 | - OSBORNE, N.; STAINIER, D.Y., ANNU. REV. PHYSIOL., (2003), vol. 65, pages 23 - 43 | - MAGUIRE, J.J., TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (2005), vol. 26, pages 448 - 454 | - SIESS, W., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2002), vol. 1582, pages 204 - 215 | - ROTHER, E. ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2003), vol. 108, pages 741 - 747 | - GARDELL ET AL., TRENDS IN MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (200602), vol. 12, no. 2 | - BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (2007), vol. 363, no. 4, pages 1001 - 8 | - BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES CNMMUN., (19921215), vol. 193, no. 2, page 497 | - J. LMUUNOL., (1999), vol. 162, page 2049 | - THE JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, (1999), vol. 162, pages 1779 - 1784 | - THE JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, (2000), vol. 163, pages 1027 - 1032 | - KOTANI ET AL., HUM. MOL. GENET., (2008), vol. 17, pages 1790 - 1797 | - ZHAO ET AL., MOL. PHARMACOL., (2008), vol. 73, no. 2, pages 587 - 600 | - SIMON ET AL., J.BIOL. CHEM., (2005), vol. 280, no. 15, page 14656 | - CAREY; SUNDBERG, ADVANCED ORGANIC CHEMISTRY 4th Ed.,, PLENUM, (2000), vol. A, B | - OZDEMIR ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (2005), vol. 61, pages 9791 - 9798 | - ACKERMANN ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2006), vol. 8, pages 3457 - 3460 | - BLAKEY ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, pages 6046 - 6047 | - DAI ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2004), vol. 6, pages 221 - 224 | - YOSHIKAI ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, pages 17978 - 17979 | - TANG ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2006), vol. 71, pages 2167 - 2169 | - MURATA ET AL., SYNTHESIS, (2001), pages 2231 - 2233 | - SINGH ET AL., Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, 2nd Ed.,, (2002), pages 754 - 757 | - MOTOTANI ET AL., HUM. MOL. GENETICS, (2008), vol. 17, no. 12 | - TSUJI ET AL., ORG. BIOMOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 1, pages 3139 - 3141 | - AN ET AL., BINCHEM. BINPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1997), vol. 231, page 619 | - CUZZOCREA S ET AL., AM JPHYSIOL LUNG CELL MOL PHYSIOL., (20070112), vol. 292, no. 5, pages L1095 - 104 | - ASHCROFT T., J. CLIN. PALH., (1988), vol. 41, no. 4, pages 467 - 470 | - HIGAZI, A. A. ET AL., CLIN EXP IMMUNOL., (20080214), vol. 152, no. 1, pages 163 - 73 | - AAPS PHARMSCITECH., (2006), vol. 7, no. 2, page E41 |