Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2883195
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.11.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
29.07.2019 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.06.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.11.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
23.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
02.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2018 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
19.01.2018 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
17.01.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.05.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
15.05.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
13.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.10.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|